Mikes Contracting Limited, a registered company, was started on 05 Oct 2005. 9429034538647 is the number it was issued. "Excavating services" (business classification E321240) is how the company has been categorised. This company has been managed by 3 directors: Michael Walter Mcdonald - an active director whose contract began on 05 Oct 2005,
Cheri Ann Mcdonald - an inactive director whose contract began on 15 Jul 2009 and was terminated on 14 Aug 2014,
Cheri Ann Draper - an inactive director whose contract began on 05 Oct 2005 and was terminated on 15 Jul 2009.
Last updated on 27 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 35 Eighteenth Avenue, Tauranga, 3112 (category: registered, physical).
Mikes Contracting Limited had been using 64 Hewletts Road, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui as their registered address up until 30 Aug 2022.
Other names for the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 23 May 2008 to 16 Sep 2010 they were named Bay Grass Cutting Limited, from 05 Oct 2005 to 23 May 2008 they were named Hammond Rentals Limited.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 10 shares) - Mcdonald, Michael Walter - located at 3112, Maketu, Te Puke.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 64 Hewletts Road, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 Aug 2017 to 30 Aug 2022
Address #2: 35 Eighteenth Avenue, Tauranga South, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Registered address used from 22 Aug 2014 to 17 Aug 2017
Address #3: 35 Eighteenth Avenue, Tauranga South, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Registered address used from 28 Aug 2012 to 22 Aug 2014
Address #4: 35 Eighteenth Avenue, Tauranga South, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Physical address used from 28 Aug 2012 to 17 Aug 2017
Address #5: M & C Mcdonald, 75 Ross Road, Tauranga, RD6 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Sep 2010 to 28 Aug 2012
Address #6: Jb Lloyd Chartered Accountants Limited, 7 Totara Street, Mount Maunganui New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 27 May 2008 to 01 Sep 2010
Address #7: 81 The Strand, Tauranga
Registered & physical address used from 28 Nov 2006 to 27 May 2008
Address #8: C/o The Invisible Office Co Ltd, 353 Devonport Road, Tauranga
Registered & physical address used from 05 Oct 2005 to 28 Nov 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 24 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Mcdonald, Michael Walter |
Maketu Te Puke RD9 New Zealand |
05 Oct 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mcdonald, Cheri Ann |
Tolaga Bay East Coast 4046 New Zealand |
05 Oct 2005 - 14 Aug 2014 |
Michael Walter Mcdonald - Director
Appointment date: 05 Oct 2005
Address: Maketu, Te Puke, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Aug 2022
Address: Hairini, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Aug 2019
Address: Greerton, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Aug 2015
Cheri Ann Mcdonald - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Jul 2009
Termination date: 14 Aug 2014
Address: Tolaga Bay, East Coast, 4046 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Aug 2012
Cheri Ann Draper - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Oct 2005
Termination date: 15 Jul 2009
Address: Omokoroa,
Address used since 22 Jul 2008
Hewletts Road Machinery Limited
71 Hewletts Road
G.d. Harrison Limited
41 Aerodrome Road
Bop Coastal Cruisers Incorporated
29 Hewletts Road
Contract Mechanical Services Limited
11 Harvard Way
Fincorp 2011 Limited
32 Hewletts Road
Vendorable Limited
5 Cherokee Place
Bay Shaping Limited
31 Inglewood Place
Coastal Fence Decks Retaining Limited
59 Hartford Avenue
Crowley Excavators Limited
Level 1, 115 The Strand
Shane Rowe Limited
16 Maihi Crescent
T&o Sutton Contractors Limited
28 Tall Oaks Way
Western Bay Earthworks Limited
109 Main Road