Pipe and Pressure Welding Limited was incorporated on 01 Jul 2005 and issued an NZ business number of 9429034681695. This registered LTD company has been managed by 1 director, named Stephen Garth Morgan - an active director whose contract began on 01 Jul 2005.
As stated in BizDb's database (updated on 16 Sep 2024), the company uses 5 addresess: 29 Hoskins Avenue, Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 (office address),
29 Hoskins Avenue, Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 (delivery address),
29 Hoskins Avenue, Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 (physical address),
29 Hoskins Avenue, Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 (registered address) among others.
Up until 14 Sep 2021, Pipe and Pressure Welding Limited had been using 9 Mersea Place, Maungatapu, Tauranga as their physical address.
BizDb identified old names used by the company: from 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Jul 2008 they were called Absolute Pipe and Pressure Welding Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 0 groups (0 shareholders in total). Pipe and Pressure Welding Limited has been categorised as "Welding work on construction projects" (ANZSIC E322430).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 29 Hoskins Avenue, Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 New Zealand
Physical & registered & service address used from 14 Sep 2021
Address #5: 29 Hoskins Avenue, Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 New Zealand
Office & delivery address used from 05 Sep 2023
Principal place of activity
224 Neilson Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 9 Mersea Place, Maungatapu, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 03 Oct 2016 to 14 Sep 2021
Address #2: 9a Mersea Place, Maungatapu, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Oct 2015 to 03 Oct 2016
Address #3: 50 Vine Avenue, Maungatapu, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Physical address used from 24 Aug 2010 to 06 Oct 2015
Address #4: 50 Vine Avenue, Maungatapu, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Registered address used from 29 Jul 2008 to 06 Oct 2015
Address #5: 50 Vine Avenue, Maungatapu, Tauranga
Physical address used from 29 Jul 2008 to 29 Jul 2008
Address #6: 50vine Avenue, Maungatapu, Tauranga New Zealand
Physical address used from 29 Jul 2008 to 24 Aug 2010
Address #7: 119 Beach Road, Te Atatu, Auckland 1008
Physical & registered address used from 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Jul 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 05 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Morgan, Stephen Garth |
Hillsborough Auckland 1042 New Zealand |
22 Jul 2008 - 22 Jul 2008 |
Individual | Morgan, Stephen Garth |
Botany South |
22 Jul 2008 - 22 Jul 2008 |
Individual | Morgan, Stephen Garth |
Te Atatu Auckland 1008 |
01 Jul 2005 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Stephen Garth Morgan - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2005
Address: Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Jun 2018
Address: Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Sep 2013
Malcolm Christie Trustee Co. Limited
14 Mersea Place
Cheviot Town Limited
252 Maungatapu Road
County Corkhouse Limited
252 Maungatapu Road,
Mardi Bleu Limited
1 Anchorage Grove
Finger & Fork Professional Caterers Limited
8 Anchorage Grove
On To It Recreation Services Limited
227 Maungatapu Road
Alline Engineering Limited
7 Seath Street
Carlton Piping Systems Limited
30 Cameron Road
Miller Fabrication & Welding Services Limited
190 Te Hono Street
Mortons Contracting Limited
49 Taipari Street
Ppw Pipeline Services Limited
9 Mersea Place
Snj Engineering Limited
389a Devonport Road