Gd & Am Marshall Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 02 May 2005. 9429034797464 is the number it was issued. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Angela Marie Marshall - an active director whose contract began on 02 May 2005,
Greg David Marshall - an active director whose contract began on 02 May 2005.
Last updated on 30 Jul 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 26 Canon Street, Timaru, Timaru, 7910 (category: registered, physical).
Gd & Am Marshall Limited had been using 45 Benmore Street, Glenwood, Timaru as their registered address until 21 Feb 2022.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders (3 groups). The first group includes 90 shares (90 per cent) held by 3 entities. Next there is the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 5 shares (5 per cent). Finally we have the third share allocation (5 shares 5 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address: 45 Benmore Street, Glenwood, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Registered address used from 18 Nov 2009 to 21 Feb 2022
Address: 45 Benmore Street, Timaru New Zealand
Physical address used from 18 Nov 2009 to 21 Feb 2022
Address: Hubbard Churcher & Co, 39 George Street, Timaru 7910
Physical & registered address used from 15 Oct 2007 to 18 Nov 2009
Address: Hubbard Churcher & Co, Chartered Accountants, 39 George Street, Timaru
Physical & registered address used from 02 May 2005 to 15 Oct 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 18 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 90 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Martin Wakefield Trust 2022 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429050079988 |
26 Canon Street Timaru 7910 New Zealand |
14 Mar 2023 - |
Individual | Marshall, Greg David |
Lake Tekapo 7999 New Zealand |
02 May 2005 - |
Individual | Marshall, Angela Marie |
Lake Tekapo 7999 New Zealand |
02 May 2005 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5 | |||
Individual | Marshall, Angela Marie |
Lake Tekapo 7999 New Zealand |
02 May 2005 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 5 | |||
Individual | Marshall, Greg David |
Lake Tekapo 7999 New Zealand |
02 May 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Simpson, Garry William |
Glenwood Timaru 7910 New Zealand |
29 Oct 2013 - 14 Mar 2023 |
Entity | Hubbard Churcher Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037867881 Company Number: 903425 |
02 May 2005 - 29 Oct 2013 | |
Entity | Hubbard Churcher Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037867881 Company Number: 903425 |
02 May 2005 - 29 Oct 2013 |
Angela Marie Marshall - Director
Appointment date: 02 May 2005
Address: Lake Tekapo, 7999 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Nov 2022
Address: Rd 17, Fairlie, 7987 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Nov 2014
Greg David Marshall - Director
Appointment date: 02 May 2005
Address: Lake Tekapo, 7999 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Nov 2022
Address: Rd 17, Fairlie, 7987 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Nov 2014
Zenco Limited
45 Benmore Street
Simpson Financial Solutions Limited
45 Benmore Street
Pipetech Services Limited
45 Benmore Street
Latill Contracting Limited
45 Benmore Street
Sherwood Downs Homestead Limited
8 Monowai Place
St Vianney's Timaru Trust
18 Aviemore Street