Napier Investments Limited was registered on 18 Apr 2005 and issued a number of 9429034812549. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 4 directors: Martin Napier - an active director whose contract started on 20 Dec 2008,
Martin Mailley - an active director whose contract started on 20 Dec 2008,
Francis Springall - an inactive director whose contract started on 19 Jun 2005 and was terminated on 27 Jan 2009,
Robert Bruce Mailley - an inactive director whose contract started on 18 Apr 2005 and was terminated on 20 Jun 2005.
As stated in BizDb's database (updated on 24 Jul 2024), the company filed 1 address: 57 Hawaiian Parade, Arkles Bay, Whangaparaoa, 0932 (types include: registered, service).
Until 15 Nov 2018, Napier Investments Limited had been using 29 Regency Park Drive, Gulf Harbour, Whangaparaoa as their registered address.
BizDb found previous aliases used by the company: from 08 Dec 2020 to 09 Dec 2020 they were named Microsoft Limited, from 08 Aug 2005 to 08 Dec 2020 they were named Financial Assets Limited and from 18 Apr 2005 to 08 Aug 2005 they were named Global Asset Investments Limited.
A total of 1001 shares are issued to 2 groups (3 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 501 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Napier, Martin (an individual) located at Gulf Harbour, Whangaparaoa postcode 0930,
Mailley, Martin (a director) located at Gulf Harbour, Whangaparaoa postcode 0930.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 49.95 per cent shares (exactly 500 shares) and includes
Napier, Martin - located at Gulf Harbour, Whangaparaoa. Napier Investments Limited is classified as "Investment - patents and copyrights" (ANZSIC L664020).
Principal place of activity
29 Regency Park Drive, Gulf Harbour, Whangaparaoa, 0930 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 29 Regency Park Drive, Gulf Harbour, Whangaparaoa, 0930 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 19 Jun 2014 to 15 Nov 2018
Address #2: Level5/369 Queen St, Auckland, Auckland, 1000 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Jul 2010 to 19 Jun 2014
Address #3: 369 Queen St, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 01 Jun 2010 to 16 Jul 2010
Address #4: 209 Columbo St, Christchurch
Registered address used from 22 Feb 2008 to 01 Jun 2010
Address #5: 10/100 Anzac Ave, Auckland
Registered address used from 08 Nov 2006 to 22 Feb 2008
Address #6: 10/100 Anzac Ave, Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 08 Nov 2006 to 16 Jul 2010
Address #7: 128 Campbell Rd, Greenlane, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 15 Aug 2005 to 08 Nov 2006
Address #8: 22 St Margarets Place, West Harbour, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 18 Apr 2005 to 15 Aug 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1001
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 01 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 501 | |||
Individual | Napier, Martin |
Gulf Harbour Whangaparaoa 0930 New Zealand |
28 May 2020 - |
Director | Mailley, Martin |
Gulf Harbour Whangaparaoa 0930 New Zealand |
18 Nov 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Napier, Martin |
Gulf Harbour Whangaparaoa 0930 New Zealand |
28 May 2020 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mailley, Martin |
Rotorua |
27 Jan 2009 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Springall, Francis |
Auckland |
20 Aug 2005 - 01 Nov 2006 |
Individual | Mailley, Robert Bruce |
West Harbour Auckland |
18 Apr 2005 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Nutarelli, Sabrina |
Whangaparoa New Zealand |
10 Feb 2009 - 18 Nov 2010 |
Individual | Audier, Joshua |
Enner Glynn Nelson 7011 New Zealand |
18 Nov 2010 - 01 Nov 2011 |
Martin Napier - Director
Appointment date: 20 Dec 2008
Address: Gulf Harbour, Whangaparaoa, 0930 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Nov 2010
Martin Mailley - Director
Appointment date: 20 Dec 2008
Address: Gulf Harbour, Whangaparaoa, 0930 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Nov 2010
Francis Springall - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Jun 2005
Termination date: 27 Jan 2009
Address: Auckland,
Address used since 01 Nov 2006
Robert Bruce Mailley - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Apr 2005
Termination date: 20 Jun 2005
Address: West Harbour, Auckland,
Address used since 18 Apr 2005
Jrh Investments Limited
29 Regency Park Drive
Bellavita Trust Corporation Limited
29 Regency Park Drive
Enonitram Limited
29 Regency Park Drive
Coast Contracting 2010 Limited
33 Regency Park Drive
Capisco Limited
15 Burwood Tce
Artmosis Limited
15 Burwood Terrace
Fab It Film Limited
Building B, 63 Apollo Drive
Kc Helicopter Holdings Limited
312 Postman Road
Nzimmigrationmedicals Limited
C/-ross Pauling & Partners
Secured Signing Ip Limited
3 Scarboro Terrace
Third Time Lucky Limited
100 Foundry Road
Trust Accountants Limited
Level 1, 5 William Laurie Place