Oconor Asset Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 24 Feb 2005. 9429034936184 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Paul Gregory O'connor - an active director whose contract began on 24 Feb 2005,
Wainne Manuka O'connor - an active director whose contract began on 24 Feb 2005.
Updated on 21 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 1210 Haupapa Street, Rotorua, 3010 (type: registered, service).
Oconor Asset Limited had been using 1210 Haupapa Street, Rotorua, Rotorua as their service address until 20 Jun 2023.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 49 shares (49%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 51 shares (51%).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 1210 Haupapa Street, Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 20 Jun 2023
Principal place of activity
141 Park Road, Katikati, Katikati, 3129 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 1210 Haupapa Street, Rotorua, Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Service address used from 16 Jun 2023 to 20 Jun 2023
Address #2: 1210 Haupapa Street, Rotorua, Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Registered address used from 14 Jun 2022 to 20 Jun 2023
Address #3: 141 Park Road, Katikati, Katikati, 3129 New Zealand
Registered address used from 01 Jul 2020 to 14 Jun 2022
Address #4: 141 Park Road, Katikati, Katikati, 3129 New Zealand
Service address used from 01 Jul 2020 to 16 Jun 2023
Address #5: 1210 Haupapa Streeet, Rotovegas New Zealand
Registered address used from 21 Jun 2010 to 01 Jul 2020
Address #6: 1210 Haupapa Street, Rotovegas New Zealand
Physical address used from 21 Jun 2010 to 01 Jul 2020
Address #7: 120 Ormond Road, Gisborne
Registered & physical address used from 24 Feb 2005 to 21 Jun 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 17 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 49 | |||
Individual | O'connor, Wainne Manuka |
Rotorua Rotorua 3010 New Zealand |
24 Feb 2005 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 51 | |||
Individual | O'connor, Paul Gregory |
Rotorua Rotorua 3010 New Zealand |
24 Feb 2005 - |
Paul Gregory O'connor - Director
Appointment date: 24 Feb 2005
Address: Rotorua, Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Jun 2022
Address: Katikati, Katikati, 3129 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jun 2020
Address: Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Jun 2014
Wainne Manuka O'connor - Director
Appointment date: 24 Feb 2005
Address: Rotorua, Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Jun 2022
Address: Katikati, Katikati, 3129 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jun 2020
Address: Whataupoko, Gisborne, 4010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2010
Sapphire Security Limited
1210 Haupapa Street
Property Holdings Limited
1202 Haupapa Street
Te Kotahitanga O Te Arawa Waka Fisheries Trust Board
1192 Haupapa Street
Te Arawa Management Limited
1194 Haupapa Street
Indigenuity Limited
1186 Haupapa Street
New Zealand Deerstalkers Association (rotorua Branch) Incorporated
C/o Rogers & Co Solicitor