E-Star Limited, a registered company, was started on 08 Nov 2004. 9429035102342 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 3 directors: Seung Man Cho - an active director whose contract began on 08 Nov 2004,
Sun Hee Cho - an active director whose contract began on 15 May 2006,
Hyun-Sook Park - an inactive director whose contract began on 08 Nov 2004 and was terminated on 15 May 2006.
Updated on 18 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: Unit Gm 65 Paul Mattews Road, Albany, Auckland, 0632 (category: physical, registered).
E-Star Limited had been using Shop S221 Westfield Shopping Centre, Albany North Shore as their physical address until 23 Jun 2014.
Old names for the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 08 Nov 2004 to 11 Jan 2010 they were called Dabu Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 500 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 500 shares (50%).
Previous addresses
Address: Shop S221 Westfield Shopping Centre, Albany North Shore New Zealand
Physical address used from 18 Jan 2010 to 23 Jun 2014
Address: Unit 13-12 Schnapper Rock Rd, Albany Auckland
Physical address used from 08 Jan 2010 to 18 Jan 2010
Address: Unit 13-12 Schnapper Rock Rd, Albany Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 08 Jan 2010 to 23 Jun 2014
Address: Shop 3 North Ridge Plaza Foodcourt, Don Mikinnon Dr, Albany, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 08 Nov 2004 to 08 Jan 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 26 Apr 2022
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Cho, Seung Man |
Whenuapai Auckland 0618 New Zealand |
08 Nov 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Cho, Sun Hee |
Whenuapai Auckland 0618 New Zealand |
29 May 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Park, Hyun-sook |
Browns Bay Auckland |
08 Nov 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Seung Man Cho - Director
Appointment date: 08 Nov 2004
Address: Whenuapai, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Apr 2020
Address: Oteha, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Jun 2014
Sun Hee Cho - Director
Appointment date: 15 May 2006
Address: Whenuapai, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Apr 2020
Address: Oteha, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Jun 2014
Hyun-sook Park - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Nov 2004
Termination date: 15 May 2006
Address: Browns Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 08 Nov 2004
Fantasy World Limited
Shop S104
Matsu Sushi Albany Limited
Shop Fc08, Westfield Albany
Ingham & Bees Management Limited
Westfield
Chongqing Qinma Food Nz Limited
Shop1,level 3, 9-11 Corinthian Drive
Stiles Holdings Limited
Level 9, 205 Queen Street
Gbpensions Limited
Mercari Business Centre