K N C Holdings Limited, a registered company, was registered on 13 Aug 2004. 9429035233664 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Repairing household non-electrical and personal good" (ANZSIC S942940) is how the company is categorised. This company has been run by 2 directors: Keith Andrew Shipston - an active director whose contract began on 01 Sep 2009,
Claire Diane Shipston - an inactive director whose contract began on 13 Aug 2004 and was terminated on 01 Sep 2019.
Updated on 28 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 21A Blighs Road, Strowan, Christchurch, 8052 (types include: postal, office).
K N C Holdings Limited had been using 32B Ward Road, Cheviot as their physical address up to 23 Oct 2014.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Shipston, Keith Andrew - located at 8052, Strowan, Christchurch.
Principal place of activity
21a Blighs Road, Strowan, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 32b Ward Road, Cheviot, 7310 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 11 Sep 2012 to 23 Oct 2014
Address #2: 91 Parnassus Road, Rd 1, Cheviot 7381 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 Sep 2008 to 11 Sep 2012
Address #3: 32b Ward Road, Cheviot 8271
Physical & registered address used from 30 Nov 2006 to 04 Sep 2008
Address #4: Markhams Mri Christchurch Limited, Level Five, 144 Kilmore Street, Christchurch
Physical & registered address used from 06 Dec 2004 to 30 Nov 2006
Address #5: Markhams Mri Christchurch Limtied, Level Two, 190 Armagh Street, Christchurch
Physical address used from 13 Aug 2004 to 06 Dec 2004
Address #6: Markhams Mri Christchurch Limited, Level Two, 190 Armagh Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 13 Aug 2004 to 06 Dec 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 05 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Shipston, Keith Andrew |
Strowan Christchurch 8052 New Zealand |
13 Aug 2004 - |
Keith Andrew Shipston - Director
Appointment date: 01 Sep 2009
Address: Strowan, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Oct 2014
Claire Diane Shipston - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Aug 2004
Termination date: 01 Sep 2019
Address: Strowan, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Oct 2014
Gorilla Contract Limited
146 Wairakei Road
Faith Family Fellowship M.o.m. Foodbank Trust
20 Pitcairn Crescent
Hollands Tree Services Limited
3 Bounty Street
Dress The Nest Limited
4 Bounty Street
Edge Deck South Island Limited
4 Bounty Street
Tour South Limited
4 Bounty Street
A1 Furniture Restoration Limited
6 Whitcher
Lynnbald Holdings Limited
53 Yare Street
Manawatu Museum Services Limited
32 Amesbury Street
Tictok Limited
Level 6
Watchcraft Company Limited
41 Dixon Street,
Wellington Piano Service Limited
409 Broadway