Scuba Doo Limited, a registered company, was registered on 01 Jul 2004. 9429035309659 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Diving school operation" (business classification P821103) is how the company was categorised. This company has been managed by 6 directors: Darrell Murray Bird - an active director whose contract began on 19 Aug 2013,
Peter Kenneth Bird - an inactive director whose contract began on 07 Jun 2013 and was terminated on 19 Aug 2013,
Darrell Bird - an inactive director whose contract began on 07 Dec 2005 and was terminated on 07 Jun 2013,
Peter Kenneth Bird - an inactive director whose contract began on 27 Jul 2005 and was terminated on 08 Dec 2005,
Darrell Murray Bird - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Jul 2004 and was terminated on 27 Jul 2005.
Last updated on 25 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 268 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, 4414 (type: delivery, postal).
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 1000 shares) - Bird, Darrell Murray - located at 4414, Whitianga, Whitianga.
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 07 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Director | Bird, Darrell Murray |
Whitianga Whitianga 3510 New Zealand |
23 Aug 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Bird, Darrell Murray |
Whitianga Whitianga 3510 New Zealand |
01 Jul 2004 - 11 Jun 2013 |
Individual | Bird, Peter Kenneth |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
11 Jun 2013 - 23 Aug 2013 |
Individual | Cromack, Dale Ingram |
Mount Maunganui |
01 Jul 2004 - 01 Jul 2004 |
Darrell Murray Bird - Director
Appointment date: 19 Aug 2013
Address: Whitianga, Whitianga, 3510 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Aug 2013
Peter Kenneth Bird - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Jun 2013
Termination date: 19 Aug 2013
Address: Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Jun 2013
Darrell Bird - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Dec 2005
Termination date: 07 Jun 2013
Address: Whitianga, Whitianga, 3510 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Mar 2011
Peter Kenneth Bird - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Jul 2005
Termination date: 08 Dec 2005
Address: Mount Maunganui,
Address used since 27 Jul 2005
Darrell Murray Bird - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2004
Termination date: 27 Jul 2005
Address: Mount Maunganui,
Address used since 01 Jul 2004
Dale Ingram Cromack - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2004
Termination date: 06 Dec 2004
Address: Mount Maunganui,
Address used since 01 Jul 2004
Rangitikei Street Limited
268 Broadway Avenue
Peter Marlow Electrical Consultant Limited
268 Broadway Avenue
Lambourn Racing Limited
268 Broadway Avenue
B C Arnold Limited
268 Broadway Avenue
Bangma Building Limited
268 Broadway Avenue
Bj's Lunch Bar Limited
268 Broadway Avenue
New Zealand Sea Adventures Limited
7 Cabin Lane
Nz Rebreathers Limited
126 Oxford Tce
Rebreathers Nz Limited
46 Gurkha Cres
Te Taiao Limited
7 Franklin Street
The Msl Company Limited
Cnr Hastings & St Aubyn Streets
Underwater Obsession Limited
287 Happy Valley Road