Paget & Associates Trustees Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 10 Jun 2004. 9429035344476 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. This company has been supervised by 4 directors: Murray Derrick Neiman - an active director whose contract started on 01 Jul 2006,
Mark Clifford Paget - an active director whose contract started on 17 Mar 2009,
Mark Paget - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Jun 2004 and was terminated on 17 Mar 2009,
Colin Gray - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Jun 2004 and was terminated on 30 Jun 2006.
Last updated on 05 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 3, 112 Tuam Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 (types include: registered, physical).
Paget & Associates Trustees Limited had been using Level 1, Unit 7, 295 Blenheim Road, Christchurch as their registered address until 27 May 2021.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Paget, Mark Clifford - located at 8011, Sydenham, Christchurch.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 1, Unit 7, 295 Blenheim Road, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 15 Apr 2013 to 27 May 2021
Address: 2nd Floor, 119 Wrights Road, Christchurch New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 Jun 2004 to 15 Apr 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 26 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Paget, Mark Clifford |
Sydenham Christchurch 8023 New Zealand |
10 Jun 2004 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Gray, Colin |
Christchurch |
10 Jun 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Murray Derrick Neiman - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2006
Address: Redwood, Christchurch, 8051 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2006
Mark Clifford Paget - Director
Appointment date: 17 Mar 2009
Address: Sydenham, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Address used since 19 May 2021
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Mar 2016
Mark Paget - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Jun 2004
Termination date: 17 Mar 2009
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 10 Jun 2004
Colin Gray - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Jun 2004
Termination date: 30 Jun 2006
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 10 Jun 2004
Ian Russell Motors Limited
Level 1, Unit 7
Lichfield Group Limited
Unit 7, 295 Blenheim Road
Star Homeware Limited
Suite 9, 301a Blenheim Road
Axis Bjj Nz Limited
Unit 6b, 303 Blenheim Road
Toa Motor Limited
Unit 6b, 303 Blenheim Road
Ij Flooring Limited
Unit 6b, 303 Blenheim Road