Rfr Building Limited, a registered company, was started on 10 May 2004. 9429035402701 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Architectural service" (business classification M692120) is how the company has been categorised. This company has been run by 3 directors: Martyn Roy Fitch - an active director whose contract started on 10 May 2004,
Keith Redman - an active director whose contract started on 10 May 2004,
Nigel Clarence Riddle - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 May 2004 and was terminated on 12 Sep 2005.
Last updated on 16 Sep 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 7/107 Ford Road, Onekawa, Napier (type: physical, registered).
Other names for the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 10 May 2004 to 06 Aug 2020 they were named Rfr Building Design & Project Management Limited.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders (3 groups). The first group consists of 1 share (1 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 49 shares (49 per cent). Finally the 3rd share allotment (50 shares 50 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 09 Oct 2019
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Redman, Susan |
Taradale New Zealand |
30 Aug 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 49 | |||
Individual | Redman, Keith |
Taradale Napier New Zealand |
10 May 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Fitch, Martyn Roy |
Ahuriri Napier 4110 New Zealand |
10 May 2004 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Fitch, Elizabeth |
Napier New Zealand |
30 Aug 2006 - 06 Mar 2014 |
Individual | Riddle, Nigel Clarence |
Greenmeadows Napier |
10 May 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Martyn Roy Fitch - Director
Appointment date: 10 May 2004
Address: Ahuriri, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Sep 2020
Address: Marewa, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Aug 2012
Keith Redman - Director
Appointment date: 10 May 2004
Address: Taradale, Napier, 4112 New Zealand
Address used since 10 May 2004
Nigel Clarence Riddle - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 May 2004
Termination date: 12 Sep 2005
Address: Greenmeadows, Napier,
Address used since 10 May 2004
Pacific Dental Specialties Limited
Unit 2, 88 Ford Road
Harbour View (2013) Limited
86 Ford Road
Point4 Limited
86 Ford Road
The Ridge Childcare Limited
86 Ford Road
R & R Medical Limited
86 Ford Road
Havelock Pool Care Limited
86 Ford Road
Bay Cad Services Limited
Unit 1
Boxclever Limited
Cnr Austin St & Cadbury Rd
Citrus Studio Architecture Limited
6 Finnis Lane
Cm Design Limited
7 May Avenue
Fresh Architecture (2003) Limited
106 A Kennedy Road
Ida Design Limited
Level 1, Shed 5 1 Lever Street