Outdoor Collections Limited, a registered company, was started on 05 Apr 2004. 9429035473657 is the NZ business number it was issued. This company has been managed by 6 directors: Douglas John Walsh - an active director whose contract began on 01 Sep 2016,
Thomas Mark Cleaver - an inactive director whose contract began on 17 Dec 2009 and was terminated on 26 Sep 2016,
Shane Michael Walsh - an inactive director whose contract began on 24 Mar 2008 and was terminated on 17 Dec 2009,
Douglas John Walsh - an inactive director whose contract began on 05 Feb 2008 and was terminated on 24 Mar 2008,
Donald Keith Cleaver - an inactive director whose contract began on 05 Apr 2004 and was terminated on 05 Feb 2008.
Last updated on 19 Sep 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level6,36 Kitchener Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (category: registered, physical).
Outdoor Collections Limited had been using Level 1, 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland as their physical address up until 20 Sep 2016.
Previous aliases used by the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 05 Apr 2004 to 05 Feb 2008 they were called Cleaver & Co Trustee No.22 Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 999 shares (99.9%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (0.1%).
Previous addresses
Address: Level 1, 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 28 Aug 2013 to 20 Sep 2016
Address: C/-cleaver Partners Ltd, Level 1, 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, 1021 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 Jul 2013 to 28 Aug 2013
Address: C/-cleaver Richards Ltd, Level 1, 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 08 Sep 2009 to 17 Jul 2013
Address: C/- Cleaver & Co Ltd, Level 1, 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn
Physical & registered address used from 05 Apr 2004 to 08 Sep 2009
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 28 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 999 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Kitchener Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036246236 |
Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
26 Sep 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Walsh, Doug |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
11 May 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Crummer Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033385754 Company Number: 1944580 |
11 May 2009 - 26 Jun 2013 | |
Entity | Zelwick Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037304386 Company Number: 1026833 |
05 Apr 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Entity | Crummer Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033385754 Company Number: 1944580 |
11 May 2009 - 26 Jun 2013 | |
Entity | Zelwick Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037304386 Company Number: 1026833 |
05 Apr 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Entity | Crummer Trustees No.85 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032658293 Company Number: 2151398 |
26 Jun 2013 - 26 Sep 2016 | |
Entity | Crummer Trustees No.85 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032658293 Company Number: 2151398 |
26 Jun 2013 - 26 Sep 2016 |
Douglas John Walsh - Director
Appointment date: 01 Sep 2016
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Nov 2021
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Nov 2017
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2016
Thomas Mark Cleaver - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Dec 2009
Termination date: 26 Sep 2016
Address: Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1144 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Dec 2015
Shane Michael Walsh - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Mar 2008
Termination date: 17 Dec 2009
Address: Greenhithe, North Shore City, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Mar 2008
Douglas John Walsh - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Feb 2008
Termination date: 24 Mar 2008
Address: Takapuna, Auckland,
Address used since 05 Feb 2008
Donald Keith Cleaver - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Apr 2004
Termination date: 05 Feb 2008
Address: 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland,
Address used since 05 Apr 2004
Neryl Valerie Butterworth - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Apr 2004
Termination date: 05 Feb 2008
Address: 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Jun 2004
Medland Trustees Limited
Level 6
J G A Properties Limited
Level 8
Ennis Limited
Level 6
Srl Dermatology Limited
Level 6 Bridgecorp House
B & M Associates Limited
Level 6 Bridgecorp House
Victoria St Trustees Limited
Lvel 6, 36 Kitchener Street