Undergroundsound Limited, a registered company, was registered on 11 Dec 2003. 9429035644347 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Film or video post-production services" (ANZSIC J551405) is how the company was classified. The company has been supervised by 5 directors: Philip Leonard Burton - an active director whose contract started on 11 Dec 2003,
Victoria Urshla Spackman - an active director whose contract started on 31 Jan 2014,
Ian Leslie - an inactive director whose contract started on 20 Mar 2013 and was terminated on 01 Dec 2023,
David Timothy Gibson - an inactive director whose contract started on 19 Oct 2007 and was terminated on 31 Jan 2014,
Benjamin James Edward Sinclair - an inactive director whose contract started on 11 Dec 2003 and was terminated on 20 Mar 2013.
Updated on 17 Sep 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 4 addresses this company uses, specifically: Level 2, 17 Garrett Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 (office address),
Level 2, 17 Garrett Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 (delivery address),
17 Garrett Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 (physical address),
17 Garrett Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 (registered address) among others.
Undergroundsound Limited had been using 41 Percy Cameron Street, Avalon, Lower Hutt as their registered address until 02 Oct 2019.
A total of 10000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 4000 shares (40%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 6000 shares (60%).
Other active addresses
Address #4: Level 2, 17 Garrett Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Office & delivery address used from 07 Sep 2021
Principal place of activity
Level 2, 17 Garrett Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 41 Percy Cameron Street, Avalon, Lower Hutt, 5011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 Oct 2018 to 02 Oct 2019
Address #2: 21 Ganges Road, Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Physical address used from 14 Sep 2011 to 04 Oct 2018
Address #3: 21 Ganges Road, Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Registered address used from 01 Jun 2011 to 04 Oct 2018
Address #4: 19-21 Broderick Road, Johnsonville, Wellington New Zealand
Physical address used from 31 Oct 2007 to 14 Sep 2011
Address #5: 19-21 Broderick Road, Johnsonville, Wellington New Zealand
Registered address used from 31 Oct 2007 to 01 Jun 2011
Address #6: 60a Kent Terrace, Wellington
Registered & physical address used from 11 Dec 2003 to 31 Oct 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 04 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 4000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | The Gibson Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040813639 |
Wellington Central Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
24 Oct 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 6000 | |||
Individual | Burton, Philip Leonard |
Korokoro Petone 5012 New Zealand |
11 Dec 2003 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Leslie, Ian |
Kelson Lower Hutt 5010 New Zealand |
08 Nov 2013 - 06 Dec 2023 |
Individual | Sinclair, Benjamin James Edward |
Silverstream Upper Hutt |
11 Dec 2003 - 08 Nov 2013 |
Philip Leonard Burton - Director
Appointment date: 11 Dec 2003
Address: Korokoro, Petone, 5012 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Dec 2003
Victoria Urshla Spackman - Director
Appointment date: 31 Jan 2014
Address: Brooklyn, Wellington, 6021 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Mar 2022
Address: Newtwon, Wellington, 6021 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Jan 2014
Address: Newtown, Wellington, 6021 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Sep 2019
Ian Leslie - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Mar 2013
Termination date: 01 Dec 2023
Address: Kelson, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Mar 2013
David Timothy Gibson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Oct 2007
Termination date: 31 Jan 2014
Address: Wellington,
Address used since 19 Oct 2007
Benjamin James Edward Sinclair - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Dec 2003
Termination date: 20 Mar 2013
Address: Silverstream, Upper Hutt, 5019 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Dec 2003
Khandallah Villas Trust Board Inc
21 Ganges Road
Amity Club Incorporated
21 Ganges Road
Flat Creek Coal Company Limited
23 Ganges Road
A.j. Woods Limited
31 Ganges Road
Affiliated Insurance Brokers Limited
31 Ganges Road
Village Quality Meats Limited
7 Ganges Road
Eternal Eye Limited
Suite H, 11 Ghuznee Street
Fox & Co Design Limited
12d Hobson Street
Milligan Media Limited
116 Tinakori Road
Onepost Limited
9 Chudleigh Grove
Prism Productions Limited
46a Spencer Street
Shiny Limited
51 Chelmsford Street