Bpac Nz Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 02 Sep 2003. 9429035792291 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been run by 27 directors: Richard Tyler - an active director whose contract began on 01 Feb 2011,
Stuart Mclauchlan - an active director whose contract began on 03 Jul 2020,
Stephen James Higgs - an active director whose contract began on 06 Sep 2021,
Karl Anthony Andrews - an active director whose contract began on 06 Sep 2021,
Murray William Tilyard - an inactive director whose contract began on 06 Sep 2021 and was terminated on 06 Dec 2022.
Updated on 24 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: Po Box 6032, Dunedin North, Dunedin, 9059 (category: postal, postal).
Bpac Nz Limited had been using South Link Health, Burns House, 10 George St, Dunedin as their physical address up to 15 Oct 2021.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 300 shares) - Cc24929 - South Link Education Trust Board - located at 9059, Dunedin Central, Dunedin.
Principal place of activity
5 Melville Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: South Link Health, Burns House, 10 George St, Dunedin New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 31 Jul 2007 to 15 Oct 2021
Address #2: Polson Higgs, 139 Moray Pl, Dunedin
Registered & physical address used from 07 Sep 2005 to 31 Jul 2007
Address #3: Polson Higgs & Co, 139 Moray Place, Dunedin
Physical & registered address used from 02 Sep 2003 to 07 Sep 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 300
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 30 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 300 | |||
Other (Other) | Cc24929 - South Link Education Trust Board |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 New Zealand |
13 Dec 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | University Of Otago Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039932334 Company Number: 245910 |
University Of Otago Leith Street, Dunedin |
02 Sep 2003 - 06 Sep 2021 |
Entity | Procare Health (pho) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035995449 Company Number: 1301340 |
06 Sep 2021 - 06 Sep 2021 | |
Entity | Procare Network Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038596513 Company Number: 650461 |
15 Sep 2006 - 06 Sep 2021 | |
Entity | The Royal New Zealand College Of General Practitioners Company Number: 210637 |
88 The Terrace Wellington |
18 Jul 2014 - 06 Sep 2021 |
Entity | Pegasus Health (charitable) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038495540 Company Number: 672691 |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 New Zealand |
02 Sep 2009 - 06 Sep 2021 |
Entity | South Link Health Incorporated Company Number: 620498 |
10 George Street Dunedin |
02 Sep 2003 - 13 Dec 2019 |
Entity | University Of Otago Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039932334 Company Number: 245910 |
University Of Otago Leith Street, Dunedin |
02 Sep 2003 - 06 Sep 2021 |
Entity | The Royal New Zealand College Of General Practitioners Company Number: 210637 |
88 The Terrace Wellington |
18 Jul 2014 - 06 Sep 2021 |
Entity | Procare Health (pho) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035995449 Company Number: 1301340 |
06 Sep 2021 - 06 Sep 2021 | |
Entity | Pegasus Health (charitable) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038495540 Company Number: 672691 |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 New Zealand |
02 Sep 2009 - 06 Sep 2021 |
Other | General Practice New Zealand Incorporated Company Number: 1142396 |
188 Lambton Quay Wellington Central 6011 New Zealand |
10 Feb 2014 - 06 Sep 2021 |
Entity | Procare Network Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038596513 Company Number: 650461 |
12-16 Nicholls Lane, Parnell Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2006 - 06 Sep 2021 |
Entity | Ipa Council Of New Zealand Incorporated Company Number: 1142396 |
02 Sep 2003 - 10 Feb 2014 | |
Entity | First Health Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039202598 Company Number: 476440 |
02 Sep 2003 - 15 Sep 2006 | |
Entity | Ipa Council Of New Zealand Incorporated Company Number: 1142396 |
02 Sep 2003 - 10 Feb 2014 | |
Entity | South Link Health Incorporated Company Number: 620498 |
10 George Street Dunedin |
02 Sep 2003 - 13 Dec 2019 |
Entity | First Health Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039202598 Company Number: 476440 |
02 Sep 2003 - 15 Sep 2006 |
Richard Tyler - Director
Appointment date: 01 Feb 2011
Address: Mount Victoria, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2011
Stuart Mclauchlan - Director
Appointment date: 03 Jul 2020
Address: Maori Hill, Dunedin, 9010 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Jul 2020
Stephen James Higgs - Director
Appointment date: 06 Sep 2021
Address: Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Sep 2021
Karl Anthony Andrews - Director
Appointment date: 06 Sep 2021
Address: Rd 1, Dunedin, 9076 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Sep 2021
Murray William Tilyard - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Sep 2021
Termination date: 06 Dec 2022
Address: Rd 2, Mosgiel, 9092 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Sep 2021
Karl Anthony Andrews - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Dec 2022
Termination date: 06 Dec 2022
Address: Rd 1, Dunedin, 9076 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Dec 2022
Janette Frances Venus White - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 May 2015
Termination date: 06 Sep 2021
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 13 May 2015
Sharon Anne Van Turnhout - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Apr 2019
Termination date: 06 Sep 2021
Address: Sawyers Bay, Port Chalmers, 9023 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Apr 2019
Kylie Maree Mcquellin - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Jun 2019
Termination date: 06 Sep 2021
Address: Broadmeadows, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Jun 2019
Lynne Maree Hayman - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Oct 2019
Termination date: 06 Sep 2021
Address: Melrose, Wellington, 6023 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Oct 2019
Jacquelyn Dorothy Ann Percy - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 May 2020
Termination date: 06 Sep 2021
Address: Pegasus, Pegasus, 7612 New Zealand
Address used since 08 May 2020
Elizabeth Christina Jane Stockley - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Jun 2020
Termination date: 06 Sep 2021
Address: Rd 1, Carterton, 5791 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jun 2020
Richard James Tyler - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Feb 2011
Termination date: 10 Jul 2020
Address: Mount Victoria, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2011
Gordon Dean Millar-coote - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Sep 2003
Termination date: 03 Jul 2020
Address: Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Sep 2009
Caroline Margaret Christie - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Dec 2017
Termination date: 08 May 2020
Address: Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Dec 2017
Richard Hugo Medlicott - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Sep 2017
Termination date: 31 Oct 2019
Address: Island Bay, Wellington, 6023 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2017
James John Reid - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Sep 2003
Termination date: 09 Apr 2019
Address: Wakari, Dunedin, 9010 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Sep 2003
Harsed Hiralal Chima - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Nov 2008
Termination date: 26 Oct 2017
Address: Marshland, Christchurch, 8051 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jul 2015
Address: New Brighton, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Aug 2017
Apisalome Sikaidoka Talemaitoga - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Sep 2016
Termination date: 01 Sep 2017
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Sep 2016
Alison Paterson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Feb 2008
Termination date: 30 Jun 2017
Address: Central Auckland, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2015
Timothy Michael Malloy - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Oct 2013
Termination date: 30 Jun 2016
Address: Wellsford, Wellsford, 0900 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Oct 2013
Peter Bernard Didsbury - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Oct 2004
Termination date: 15 May 2015
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Oct 2004
Geoffrey Henry James Vause - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Sep 2012
Termination date: 16 Jul 2013
Address: Redwoodtown, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Sep 2012
Brett Philip Roche - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Feb 2008
Termination date: 31 May 2010
Address: Takapuna, North Shore City,
Address used since 19 Feb 2008
Stephen Paul Mccormack - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Feb 2008
Termination date: 29 Oct 2008
Address: South Shore, Christchurch,
Address used since 19 Feb 2008
Douglas Donald Baird - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Sep 2003
Termination date: 19 Feb 2008
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 02 Sep 2003
Jonathon Edward Simon - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Sep 2003
Termination date: 26 Oct 2004
Address: Devonport, Auckland,
Address used since 02 Sep 2003
Tony Baas Trustee Limited
10 George Street
Elle Perriam Trustee Limited
10 George Street
Fire Design Solutions Limited
10 George Street
Alexandra Vintners Limited
10 George Street
493 Leith Street Limited
10 George Street
Bruggemann-lobitz Trustees Limited
10 George Street