Pekatahi Ayrshires Limited, a removed company, was incorporated on 25 Jul 2003. 9429035857914 is the NZ business number it was issued. This company has been run by 3 directors: Bruce Leonard Fowell - an active director whose contract began on 25 Jul 2003,
Margaret Jean Fowell - an active director whose contract began on 07 Jul 2014,
Allan James Fowell - an inactive director whose contract began on 25 Jul 2003 and was terminated on 11 Mar 2005.
Updated on 24 Jul 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 1 Anz Building, 236-238 The Strand, Whakatane, 3120 (category: registered, physical).
Pekatahi Ayrshires Limited had been using 259 The Strand, Whakatane, Whakatane as their registered address up to 14 Nov 2018.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 500 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 500 shares (50%).
Previous addresses
Address: 259 The Strand, Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 24 Apr 2018 to 14 Nov 2018
Address: 36 Boon Street, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 17 Oct 2016 to 24 Apr 2018
Address: First Floor, 88 The Strand, Whakatane New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 25 Jul 2003 to 17 Oct 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 05 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Fowell, Bruce Leonard |
Rd 1 Whakatane 3191 New Zealand |
25 Jul 2003 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Fowell, Margaret Jean |
Rd 1 Whakatane 3191 New Zealand |
04 Aug 2008 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Fowell, Allan James |
Taneatua |
25 Jul 2003 - 22 Mar 2005 |
Bruce Leonard Fowell - Director
Appointment date: 25 Jul 2003
Address: Rd 1, Whakatane, 3191 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Nov 2011
Margaret Jean Fowell - Director
Appointment date: 07 Jul 2014
Address: Rd 1, Whakatane, 3191 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Jul 2014
Allan James Fowell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Jul 2003
Termination date: 11 Mar 2005
Address: Taneatua,
Address used since 25 Jul 2003
Whakatane Philatelic Society Incorporated
Po Box 114
Beacon Print Hawkes Bay Limited
32 Pyne Street
Calnar Business Systems (2018) Limited
32 Pyne Street
Beacon Print Limited
32 Pyne Street
Beacon Property Development Limited
32 Pyne Street
Dudfield Bryce Printers Limited
32 Pyne Street