Education New Zealand International Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 17 Jun 2003. 9429035948865 is the business number it was issued. "Management consultancy service" (business classification M696245) is how the company was classified. The company has been supervised by 8 directors: Alan Bertram Pearson - an active director whose contract began on 17 Jun 2003,
Gavin Maxwell Faull - an active director whose contract began on 29 Jan 2004,
Ray Wallace Thorburn - an inactive director whose contract began on 31 Mar 2005 and was terminated on 04 Sep 2018,
Jennifer Mary Shipley - an inactive director whose contract began on 19 Jan 2004 and was terminated on 28 Feb 2012,
John Brian Milne - an inactive director whose contract began on 08 Dec 2003 and was terminated on 30 Sep 2004.
Last updated on 23 Jul 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 75 Moutere Road, Rd 1, Levin, 5571 (types include: physical, service).
Education New Zealand International Limited had been using 152 Ngarara Road, Waikanae 6454 as their registered address until 18 Aug 2006.
A total of 10000 shares are issued to 4 shareholders (4 groups). The first group is comprised of 1500 shares (15%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 1000 shares (10%). Finally there is the 3rd share allocation (6000 shares 60%) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
37a Newnham Road, Rd 4, Whakamarama, 3174 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 152 Ngarara Road, Waikanae 6454
Registered & physical address used from 22 Jan 2004 to 18 Aug 2006
Address: Level 18, Qantas House, 191 Queen Street, Auckland, New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 17 Jun 2003 to 22 Jan 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 10 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1500 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Leisure Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039215246 |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
27 Jul 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Thorburn, Ray Wallace |
Petone Lower Hutt New Zealand |
19 May 2005 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 6000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Prime Consulting International Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037116880 |
Rd1 Levin, New Zealand |
17 Jun 2003 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1500 | |||
Individual | Shipley, Jennifer Mary |
Newmarket, Auckland New Zealand |
27 Jul 2004 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | The Cambridge Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036864256 Company Number: 1145162 |
17 Jun 2003 - 27 Jul 2004 | |
Entity | The Cambridge Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036864256 Company Number: 1145162 |
17 Jun 2003 - 27 Jul 2004 |
Alan Bertram Pearson - Director
Appointment date: 17 Jun 2003
Address: Rd 1, Levin, 5571 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Sep 2009
Gavin Maxwell Faull - Director
Appointment date: 29 Jan 2004
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jan 2004
Ray Wallace Thorburn - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Mar 2005
Termination date: 04 Sep 2018
Address: Raumati, Paraparaumu, 5032 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Mar 2005
Jennifer Mary Shipley - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Jan 2004
Termination date: 28 Feb 2012
Address: 27 George Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Sep 2009
John Brian Milne - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Dec 2003
Termination date: 30 Sep 2004
Address: Otaki,
Address used since 08 Dec 2003
Robert Edward Jeffrey - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Jun 2003
Termination date: 04 Jun 2004
Address: R D 6, Tauranga, Bay Of Plenty, New Zealand,
Address used since 17 Jun 2003
Kenneth Leonard Eagle - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Jun 2003
Termination date: 02 Dec 2003
Address: Northcote, Auckland, New Zealand,
Address used since 17 Jun 2003
Jennifer Mary Shipley - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Jun 2003
Termination date: 20 Nov 2003
Address: Newmarket, Auckland, New Zealand,
Address used since 17 Jun 2003
Finest Foods International Limited
75 Moutere Road
Prime Consulting International Limited
75 Moutere Road
Bramber New Zealand Limited
75 Moutere Road
Prime Nimmo-bell Limited
75 Moutere Road
Levin Golf Club Incorporated
Moutere Road
Brady Building Consultants Limited
275 Oxford Street
Chase Consulting And Construction Limited
30 Queen Street
Dynamique Limited
72 Salisbury Street
Enterprise Governance Consulting Limited
361 Waka Tete Place
Prime Nimmo-bell Limited
75 Moutere Road
Truesight Limited
2 Ngaio Street