Swordfish Holdings Limited, a registered company, was started on 13 Feb 2003. 9429036159079 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Rental of commercial property" (ANZSIC L671250) is how the company is categorised. The company has been managed by 3 directors: Michael John Davies - an active director whose contract started on 13 Feb 2003,
John Gerard Darby - an active director whose contract started on 13 Jan 2004,
John Mcrae Martin - an inactive director whose contract started on 13 Feb 2003 and was terminated on 08 Aug 2011.
Updated on 05 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 11-17 Church Street, Queenstown, Level 2, Queenstown, 9300 (types include: registered, physical).
Swordfish Holdings Limited had been using 160 Centennial Avenue, Arrowtown as their registered address up until 17 Feb 2022.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 50 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%).
Previous addresses
Address: 160 Centennial Avenue, Arrowtown New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 09 Jan 2008 to 17 Feb 2022
Address: No 1 Mcchesney Road, Arthur's Point, Queenstown
Physical & registered address used from 07 Jan 2004 to 09 Jan 2008
Address: No 1 Ncchesney Road, Arthur's Point, Queenstown
Registered address used from 22 Dec 2003 to 07 Jan 2004
Address: No 1 Mcchesney Road, Arthur's Point, Queenstown
Physical address used from 22 Dec 2003 to 07 Jan 2004
Address: Level 1, The Station, Cnr Camp & Shotover Streets, Queenstown
Physical & registered address used from 13 Feb 2003 to 22 Dec 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 15 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Trojan Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039840073 |
44 Camp Street Queenstown 9300 New Zealand |
19 Mar 2019 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Lion Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038281808 |
Arrowtown Arrowtown 9371 New Zealand |
13 Feb 2004 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Monaghan Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037706555 Company Number: 936867 |
44 Camp Street Queenstown |
13 Feb 2003 - 19 Mar 2019 |
Entity | John Martin Management Co. Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039775726 Company Number: 292911 |
13 Feb 2003 - 06 Sep 2011 | |
Entity | John Martin Management Co. Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039775726 Company Number: 292911 |
13 Feb 2003 - 06 Sep 2011 | |
Entity | Monaghan Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037706555 Company Number: 936867 |
44 Camp Street Queenstown |
13 Feb 2003 - 19 Mar 2019 |
Michael John Davies - Director
Appointment date: 13 Feb 2003
Address: Hogans Gully Road, Queenstown, 9370 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Feb 2016
John Gerard Darby - Director
Appointment date: 13 Jan 2004
Address: Queenstown, 9371 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Feb 2023
Address: Queenstown, Queenstown, 9371 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Feb 2016
John Mcrae Martin - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Feb 2003
Termination date: 08 Aug 2011
Address: Lake Hayes Road, Queenstown,
Address used since 13 Feb 2003
Highland Capital Investments Limited
160 Centennial Avenue
Lowburn Security Holdings Limited
160 Centennial Avenue
Ajr5 Trust Co Limited
160 Centennial Avenue
Highland Capital No. 2 Limited
160 Centennial Avenue
Industrial Place Holdings Limited
160 Centennial Avenue
Two Wild Sisters Limited
160 Centennial Avenue
Drewlian Holdings Limited
115 Essex Avenue
Harp Properties Limited
6 Bloxham Lane
Lowburn Security Holdings Limited
160 Centennial Avenue
Sugarloaf Estates Limited
4 Shanahan Lane
Take 5 2003 Limited
160 Centennial Avenue
Two Wild Sisters Limited
160 Centennial Avenue