Punga & Pine Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 25 Nov 2002. 9429036233885 is the number it was issued. The company has been managed by 1 director, named Frances Alexandra Clervaux Chaytor - an active director whose contract started on 25 Nov 2002.
Last updated on 22 Jul 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 45 Queen Street, Blenheim, Blenheim, 7201 (category: registered, physical).
Punga & Pine Limited had been using 52 Scott Street, Blenheim, Blenheim as their physical address up until 06 Jul 2017.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 1000 shares) - Chaytor, Frances Alexandra Clervaux - located at 7201, Springlands, Blenheim.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 52 Scott Street, Blenheim, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 05 Apr 2016 to 06 Jul 2017
Address #2: 52 Scott Street, Blenheim, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 02 Apr 2015 to 05 Apr 2016
Address #3: Tva Limited, Chartered Accountants, 52 Scott Street, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Mar 2013 to 02 Apr 2015
Address #4: 52 Scott Street, Blenheim New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 25 Mar 2004 to 11 Mar 2013
Address #5: C/- Lock & Associates, 65 Seymour Street, Blenheim
Physical & registered address used from 25 Nov 2002 to 25 Mar 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 27 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Chaytor, Frances Alexandra Clervaux |
Springlands Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
18 Mar 2004 - |
Frances Alexandra Clervaux Chaytor - Director
Appointment date: 25 Nov 2002
Address: Springlands, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Dec 2018
Address: Blenheim, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2013
Ariki New Zealand Limited
45 Queen Street
Willowlea Vineyard Limited
45 Queen Street
Medway Hills Limited
45 Queen Street
Wither Hill Limited
45 Queen Street
Pescini Trustee Limited
45 Queen Street
Hilary Weaver Trustees Limited
45 Queen Street