Potok Company Limited was registered on 09 Sep 2002 and issued an NZ business number of 9429036343300. The registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: Aleksandar Jovanovic - an active director whose contract began on 09 Sep 2002,
Soudalayphone Paseuth - an inactive director whose contract began on 17 Jun 2011 and was terminated on 09 May 2012,
Sasa Punosevac - an inactive director whose contract began on 17 Jun 2011 and was terminated on 01 Nov 2011.
As stated in BizDb's database (last updated on 15 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: 13 Te Puroa Pl, Huntington, Hamilton, 3210 (category: postal, office).
Up until 12 Sep 2018, Potok Company Limited had been using 8 Castlewold Place, Huntington, Hamilton as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Jovanovic, Aleksandar (an individual) located at Huntington, Hamilton postcode 3210. Potok Company Limited has been categorised as "Migration consulting and service" (business classification M699940).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 13 Te Puroa Pl, Huntington, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Postal address used from 02 Sep 2023
Principal place of activity
13 Te Puroa Pl, Huntington, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 8 Castlewold Place, Huntington, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 13 Sep 2016 to 12 Sep 2018
Address #2: 11b Commons Avenue, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 12 Jan 2016 to 13 Sep 2016
Address #3: 212a East Coast Road, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 29 Sep 2015 to 12 Jan 2016
Address #4: 14 Holland Road, Hillcrest, Auckland, 0627 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 27 Jun 2011 to 29 Sep 2015
Address #5: 212 East Coast Road, Milford, North Shore, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 03 Oct 2008 to 27 Jun 2011
Address #6: 75 Trianlge Road, Massey, Auckland, New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 09 Sep 2002 to 03 Oct 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 01 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Jovanovic, Aleksandar |
Huntington Hamilton 3210 New Zealand |
09 Sep 2002 - |
Aleksandar Jovanovic - Director
Appointment date: 09 Sep 2002
Address: Huntington, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Sep 2018
Address: Huntington, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Sep 2016
Soudalayphone Paseuth - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Jun 2011
Termination date: 09 May 2012
Address: Hillcrest, Auckland, 0627 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jun 2011
Sasa Punosevac - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Jun 2011
Termination date: 01 Nov 2011
Address: Hillcrest, Auckland, 0627 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jun 2011
Waikato Burn Support Charitable Trust
5 Castlewold Place
Complete Wellbeing Center
18 Ballantrae Place
Lfb Limited
53 Keswick Crescent
Loeffen Trustee Limited
53 Keswick Crescent
Maclo Limited
53 Keswick Crescent
Delytics Trust Limited
53 Keswick Crescent
Achievable Dream Limited
13 Blairgowrie Place
Beston Limited
2 Lamont Street
Future New Zealand Immigration Limited
3 Harwich Court
New Zealand Shores Limited
2/103 Thomas Road
Sekhri Immigration Limited
6 Oolong Court
Total Migration & Enterprises Limited
73 Thomas Road