Harv Services Limited was started on 08 Mar 2002 and issued a number of 9429036625154. The registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Amy Aeim Feng - an active director whose contract began on 29 Jun 2018,
Henry Yu Feng - an inactive director whose contract began on 08 Mar 2002 and was terminated on 09 Jul 2018,
Amy Aeim Feng - an inactive director whose contract began on 08 Mar 2002 and was terminated on 28 Apr 2004.
According to our database (last updated on 09 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: Po Box 67059, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1349 (type: postal, office).
Until 16 Sep 2011, Harv Services Limited had been using 540 Great South Road, Greenlane, , Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
The Harv Family Trust (Henry Feng, Amy Feng and Li Wang As Trustees) (an other) located at Mount Eden, Auckland postcode 1024. Harv Services Limited was classified as "Document preparation services nec" (business classification N729215).
Principal place of activity
410 Mount Eden Road, Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 540 Great South Road, Greenlane, , Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 18 Nov 2004 to 16 Sep 2011
Address #2: 540 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 18 Nov 2004 to 18 Nov 2004
Address #3: 2/1 Ballater Place, Highland Park, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 08 Mar 2002 to 18 Nov 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 04 Dec 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Other (Other) | The Harv Family Trust (henry Feng, Amy Feng And Li Wang As Trustees) |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
25 Nov 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Feng, Amy Aeim |
Highland Park Auckland |
08 May 2004 - 08 May 2004 |
Individual | Feng, Henry Yu |
Highland Park Auckland |
08 Mar 2002 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Amy Aeim Feng - Director
Appointment date: 29 Jun 2018
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jun 2018
Henry Yu Feng - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Mar 2002
Termination date: 09 Jul 2018
Address: Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Sep 2011
Amy Aeim Feng - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Mar 2002
Termination date: 28 Apr 2004
Address: Highland Park, Auckland,
Address used since 08 Mar 2002
Oaklands Trustees Limited
410 Mount Eden Road
Henry Feng Lawyers Limited
410 Mount Eden Road
Wow Development Limited
410a Mount Eden Road
The Charitable Trust Of The Valley And Mt Eden Roads Church
Cnr Valley Rd & Mt Eden Rd
The Valley Road Church Charitable Trust
Cnr Valley Road & Mt Eden Road
Loft Beauty Boutique Limited
414a Mount Eden Road
Accredit Immigration & Citizenship Consultancy Limited
Level 2, 27 Gillies Ave
Gizmos Gadgets Limited
3/88 King George Ave
Kjs Enterprises Limited
Flat 6d, 435 New North Road
Medsurgbio Limited
127 Balmoral Road
Mike Wagg Editing Limited
2/2 Valley Road
The Write People Limited
12 Woodside Road