Peg Holdings Limited was started on 20 Dec 2001 and issued an NZBN of 9429036702435. This registered LTD company has been run by 4 directors: Elaine Lochead - an active director whose contract started on 20 Dec 2001,
Peter Lochead - an active director whose contract started on 20 Dec 2001,
Tony Earl Lawrence - an active director whose contract started on 16 Jun 2021,
Gregory Neil Robison - an inactive director whose contract started on 20 Dec 2001 and was terminated on 16 Jun 2021.
According to our information (updated on 23 Aug 2024), the company registered 2 addresses: Level 1, 247 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 (registered address),
Level 1, 247 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 (physical address),
Level 1, 247 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 (service address),
12C Mimiha Ridge Road, Matata, 3194 (other address) among others.
Until 01 Jun 2021, Peg Holdings Limited had been using 12C Mimiha Ridge Road, Matata as their physical address.
A total of 120 shares are allocated to 5 groups (9 shareholders in total). In the first group, 39 shares are held by 3 entities, namely:
Lawrence, Christine Marie (an individual) located at Rd 3, Oropi postcode 3173,
Lawrence, Tony Earl (an individual) located at Rd 3, Oropi postcode 3173,
Holland Beckett Trustee No.6 Limited (an entity) located at Tauranga postcode 3110.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 0.83% shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Lawrence, Tony Earl - located at Rd 3, Oropi.
The 3rd share allocation (1 share, 0.83%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Lochead, Elaine, located at Tairua, Tairua (an individual).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 12c Mimiha Ridge Road, Matata, 3194 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 04 Apr 2018 to 01 Jun 2021
Address #2: 266 Maunganui Road, Mount Maunganui New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 Apr 2002 to 04 Apr 2018
Address #3: C/- Focus, Cnr Pyne & Mcalister Streets, Whakatane
Registered & physical address used from 20 Dec 2001 to 17 Apr 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 120
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 21 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 39 | |||
Individual | Lawrence, Christine Marie |
Rd 3 Oropi 3173 New Zealand |
17 Jun 2021 - |
Individual | Lawrence, Tony Earl |
Rd 3 Oropi 3173 New Zealand |
17 Jun 2021 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Holland Beckett Trustee No.6 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034354841 |
Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
17 Jun 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Lawrence, Tony Earl |
Rd 3 Oropi 3173 New Zealand |
17 Jun 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Lochead, Elaine |
Tairua Tairua 3508 New Zealand |
26 May 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Lochead, Peter |
Tairua New Zealand |
26 May 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 78 | |||
Individual | Mcfadden, Christopher James |
Te Puke New Zealand |
26 May 2004 - |
Individual | Lochead, Peter |
Tairua New Zealand |
26 May 2004 - |
Individual | Lochead, Elaine |
Tairua Tairua 3508 New Zealand |
26 May 2004 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Robison, Gregory Neil |
Maraetotara Whakatane 3120 New Zealand |
26 May 2004 - 17 Jun 2021 |
Entity | Jk Hamilton Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037386726 Company Number: 1011446 |
Level 5, Harrington House Harington Street, Tauranga |
07 Jul 2008 - 17 Jun 2021 |
Entity | Jk Hamilton Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037386726 Company Number: 1011446 |
Level 5, Harrington House Harington Street, Tauranga |
07 Jul 2008 - 17 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Robison, Gregory Neil |
Maraetotara Whakatane 3120 New Zealand |
26 May 2004 - 17 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Robison, Gregory Neil |
Maraetotara Whakatane 3120 New Zealand |
07 Jul 2008 - 17 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Robison, Gregory Neil |
Maraetotara Whakatane 3120 New Zealand |
07 Jul 2008 - 17 Jun 2021 |
Entity | Hamertons Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038282553 Company Number: 816567 |
20 Dec 2001 - 19 May 2006 | |
Entity | Hamertons Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038282553 Company Number: 816567 |
20 Dec 2001 - 19 May 2006 |
Elaine Lochead - Director
Appointment date: 20 Dec 2001
Address: Tairua, Tairua, 3508 New Zealand
Address used since 25 May 2021
Address: Tairua, Tairua, 3508 New Zealand
Address used since 20 May 2016
Peter Lochead - Director
Appointment date: 20 Dec 2001
Address: Tairua, Tairua, 3508 New Zealand
Address used since 25 May 2021
Address: Tairua, Tairua, 3508 New Zealand
Address used since 20 May 2016
Tony Earl Lawrence - Director
Appointment date: 16 Jun 2021
Address: Rd 3, Oropi, 3173 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Jun 2021
Gregory Neil Robison - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Dec 2001
Termination date: 16 Jun 2021
Address: Maraetotara, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Address used since 21 May 2020
Address: Ohope, Ohope, 3121 New Zealand
Address used since 27 May 2010
Russell Bros Limited
12c Mimiha Ridge Road
Radio Whakatane Limited
12c Mimiha Ridge Road
Windjammer Consultants Limited
12c Mimiha Ridge Road
Farmacc Properties Limited
12c Mimiha Ridge Road
Alloway Properties Limited
12c Mimiha Ridge Road
Portside Holdings Limited
12c Mimiha Ridge Road