C4P Limited was started on 04 May 2001 and issued an NZBN of 9429036916825. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Owen Beveridge Brown - an active director whose contract started on 04 May 2001,
Angela Niki Brown - an inactive director whose contract started on 04 May 2001 and was terminated on 02 Oct 2017.
According to BizDb's information (last updated on 20 Jul 2024), the company registered 2 addresses: 8A Kipling St, Johnsonville, Wellington, 6037 (physical address),
8A Kipling St, Johnsonville, Wellington, 6037 (service address),
8A Kipling St, Johnsonville, Wellington, 6037 (registered address),
6A Hapua Street, Hataitai, Wellington, 6021 (other address) among others.
Up to 08 Oct 2021, C4P Limited had been using 2/166 Moxham Ave, Hataitai, Wellington as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Brown, Owen Beveridge (an individual) located at Johnsonville, Wellington postcode 6037. C4P Limited has been categorised as "Ventilation equipment installation nec" (ANZSIC E323340).
Principal place of activity
2/166 Moxham Ave, Hataitai, Wellington, 6021 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 2/166 Moxham Ave, Hataitai, Wellington, 6021 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 11 Oct 2018 to 08 Oct 2021
Address #2: 31 Ribble Street, Island Bay, Wellington, 6023 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 Oct 2017 to 11 Oct 2018
Address #3: 6a Hapua Street, Hataitai, Wellington, 6021 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 07 Oct 2015 to 10 Oct 2017
Address #4: 20 Konini Road, Hataitai, Wellington, 6021 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Oct 2014 to 07 Oct 2015
Address #5: 110 Waipapa Road, Hataitai, Wellington New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 May 2001 to 06 Oct 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 09 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Brown, Owen Beveridge |
Johnsonville Wellington 6037 New Zealand |
04 May 2001 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Brown, Angela Niki |
Hataitai Wellington 6021 New Zealand |
04 May 2001 - 02 Oct 2017 |
Owen Beveridge Brown - Director
Appointment date: 04 May 2001
Address: Johnsonville, Wellington, 6037 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Sep 2021
Address: Hataitai, Wellington, 6021 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Oct 2018
Address: Island Bay, Wellington, 6023 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Oct 2017
Address: Hataitai, Wellington, 6021 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Sep 2015
Angela Niki Brown - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 May 2001
Termination date: 02 Oct 2017
Address: Hataitai, Wellington, 6021 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Sep 2015
Reminisce Readers Limited
Unit 11, 3 Severn Street
Clockwork Creative Productions Limited
43 Ribble Street
Vol Limited
11 Ribble Street
Penley Investments Limited
12 Ribble Street
Stephanie Faulknor Limited
8 Ribble Street
Ahc Trading Company Limited
5 Severn Street
B A Heat Pumps Limited
51 Ernest St
Drivaire 2007 Limited
Bdo House
Energysave Limited
4 Kowhai Road
Negawatt Resources Limited
444 Muritai Road
Solarhomes Limited
C/- Millar & Miller Limited