Lynford Furniture Limited, a registered company, was started on 16 Mar 2001. 9429036979455 is the number it was issued. The company has been managed by 3 directors: Hamish Frank Greenwood - an active director whose contract began on 24 May 2022,
Kay Patricia Thomason - an inactive director whose contract began on 16 Mar 2001 and was terminated on 24 May 2022,
Lindsay Barry Thomason - an inactive director whose contract began on 16 Mar 2001 and was terminated on 21 Dec 2015.
Updated on 17 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 2 Alfred Street, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 (category: registered, service).
Lynford Furniture Limited had been using 22 Scott Street, Blenheim as their registered address up until 29 May 2017.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 30 shares (30 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 70 shares (70 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 22 Scott Street, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 03 Aug 2016 to 29 May 2017
Address #2: 22 Scott Street, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Aug 2011 to 03 Aug 2016
Address #3: 22 Scott Street, Blenheim New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 16 Mar 2001 to 01 Aug 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 29 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 30 | |||
Individual | Greenwood, Melanie Jane |
Springlands Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
16 May 2022 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 70 | |||
Individual | Greenwood, Hamish Frank |
Springlands Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
27 Nov 2017 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Thomason, Kay Patricia |
Yelverton Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
16 Mar 2001 - 16 May 2022 |
Individual | Thomason, Kay Patricia |
Yelverton Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
16 Mar 2001 - 16 May 2022 |
Individual | Thomason, Lindsay |
Yelverton Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
16 Mar 2001 - 23 Dec 2015 |
Hamish Frank Greenwood - Director
Appointment date: 24 May 2022
Address: Springlands, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Jan 2023
Address: Renwick, Renwick, 7204 New Zealand
Address used since 24 May 2022
Kay Patricia Thomason - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Mar 2001
Termination date: 24 May 2022
Address: Yelverton, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jul 2015
Lindsay Barry Thomason - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Mar 2001
Termination date: 21 Dec 2015
Address: Yelverton, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jul 2014
Wairau River Wines Limited
2 Alfred Street
8 Wired Brewing Limited
2 Alfred Street
Bryce Trustee Limited
2 Alfred Street
Alva Limited
2 Alfred Street
Crow Tavern Limited
2 Alfred Street
G & S Moleta Trustee Limited
2 Alfred Street