Sps Trustees Limited, a registered company, was registered on 30 Aug 2000. 9429037161934 is the NZBN it was issued. The company has been supervised by 5 directors: Ventry John Plummer - an active director whose contract started on 30 Aug 2000,
Simon Ventry Plummer - an active director whose contract started on 22 Apr 2013,
Eric Gordon Borrie - an inactive director whose contract started on 13 May 2010 and was terminated on 22 Apr 2013,
Barry Ralph Vincent - an inactive director whose contract started on 30 Aug 2000 and was terminated on 04 May 2010,
Michael James Shaw - an inactive director whose contract started on 30 Aug 2000 and was terminated on 26 Feb 2001.
Updated on 19 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 32 Coverdale Street, Napier, Hawkes Bay, 4110 (category: registered, physical).
Sps Trustees Limited had been using 32 Coverdale Street, Napier as their registered address until 22 Jun 2016.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 999 shares (99.9 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (0.1 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 32 Coverdale Street, Napier New Zealand
Registered address used from 29 Jul 2008 to 22 Jun 2016
Address #2: 60 Taradale Road, Napier
Registered & physical address used from 30 Aug 2000 to 29 Jul 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 25 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 999 | |||
Individual | Plummer, Ventry |
Napier |
30 Aug 2000 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Plummer, Simon Ventry |
Onekawa Napier 4110 New Zealand |
22 Apr 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Vincent, Barry Ralph |
Bayswater Marina Auckland |
30 Aug 2000 - 05 May 2010 |
Individual | Borrie, Eric Gordon |
Havelock North New Zealand |
13 May 2010 - 22 Apr 2013 |
Ventry John Plummer - Director
Appointment date: 30 Aug 2000
Address: Onekawa, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Jun 2016
Simon Ventry Plummer - Director
Appointment date: 22 Apr 2013
Address: Onekawa, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Apr 2013
Eric Gordon Borrie - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 May 2010
Termination date: 22 Apr 2013
Address: Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jun 2010
Barry Ralph Vincent - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Aug 2000
Termination date: 04 May 2010
Address: Symonds Street, Auckland,
Address used since 23 Aug 2005
Michael James Shaw - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Aug 2000
Termination date: 26 Feb 2001
Address: Hastings,
Address used since 30 Aug 2000
Simrac Limited
32 Coverdale Street
Isadec Limited
32 Coverdale Street
Wealth Builders (nz) Limited
32 Coverdale Street
Vpfs Holdings Limited
32 Coverdale Street
Ven Plummer Financial Services Limited
32 Coverdale Street
Hawkes Bay Caravan And Camping Club Incorporated
9 Trevelyan Street