Edens Paddock Limited, a registered company, was registered on 13 Apr 2000. 9429037355760 is the NZ business number it was issued. The company has been run by 2 directors: Paul Albert Dallimore - an active director whose contract started on 06 Sep 2007,
Christelle Jane Dallimore - an inactive director whose contract started on 13 Apr 2000 and was terminated on 01 Mar 2013.
Last updated on 21 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 17 Main Street, Oxford, 7430 (type: physical, registered).
Edens Paddock Limited had been using Level 5, Torrens House, 195 Hereford Street, Christchurch as their registered address up to 01 Mar 2013.
More names used by this company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 13 Apr 2000 to 08 Feb 2007 they were called Sachs-Coburg International Limited.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 500 shares) - Oxford Equity Limited - located at 7430, Oxford.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 5, Torrens House, 195 Hereford Street, Christchurch New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Oct 2002 to 01 Mar 2013
Address: C/- Farry & Co., Solicitors, Level 10, Harbour View Bldg, 152 Quay Str, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 13 Apr 2000 to 01 Oct 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 06 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Oxford Equity Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035355250 |
Oxford 7430 New Zealand |
24 Jul 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Other | Paul A Dallimore As Trustee For Paul A Dallimore Family Trust | 24 Mar 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Other | Paul A Dallimore Family Trust | 24 Mar 2006 - 24 Mar 2006 | |
Individual | Sigglekow, Christelle Jane |
Redcliffs Christchurch |
13 Apr 2000 - 24 Mar 2006 |
Other | Null - Paul A Dallimore Family Trust | 24 Mar 2006 - 24 Mar 2006 | |
Other | Null - Paul A Dallimore As Trustee For Paul A Dallimore Family Trust | 24 Mar 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Paul Albert Dallimore - Director
Appointment date: 06 Sep 2007
Address: Oxford, Oxford, 7430 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2015
Christelle Jane Dallimore - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Apr 2000
Termination date: 01 Mar 2013
Address: Redcliffs, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Feb 2010
Larel Investment Limited
17 Main Street
Oxford Equity Limited
17 Main Street
Sachs-coburg International Limited
17 Main Street
South Island Property Trust Limited
17 Main Street
Highgate Group Limited
17 Main Street
Highgate Property Management Limited
17 Main Street