Farmcare Nz Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 15 Oct 1999. 9429037459666 is the NZBN it was issued. "Agricultural services nec" (business classification A052920) is how the company was categorised. This company has been supervised by 5 directors: Donald John Maccoll - an active director whose contract started on 15 Oct 1999,
Grant Blackler - an active director whose contract started on 01 Mar 2022,
Christopher John Mulvaney - an inactive director whose contract started on 15 Oct 1999 and was terminated on 03 Feb 2022,
John Arthur Harrison - an inactive director whose contract started on 15 Oct 1999 and was terminated on 30 Apr 2020,
Bryan Joseph Mckay - an inactive director whose contract started on 15 Oct 1999 and was terminated on 16 Jun 2000.
Last updated on 31 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: P O Box 83, Te Awamutu, 3800 (category: postal, delivery).
Farmcare Nz Limited had been using 53 Mutu Street, Te Awamutu as their registered address until 05 Feb 2003.
Old names used by the company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 15 Oct 1999 to 05 Jan 2016 they were called Agrinetworks Limited.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Veterinary Enterprises Group Limited - located at 3800, Te Awamutu 3800.
Principal place of activity
49 Benson Road, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 53 Mutu Street, Te Awamutu
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 05 Feb 2003
Address #2: 53 Mutu Street, Te Awamutu
Physical address used from 18 Oct 1999 to 05 Feb 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 03 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Veterinary Enterprises Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037219338 |
Te Awamutu 3800 |
14 Aug 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Veterinary Enterprises Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038571114 Company Number: 656219 |
15 Oct 1999 - 14 Aug 2007 | |
Individual | Mulvaney, Christopher John |
R D 1, Cambridge New Zealand |
15 Oct 1999 - 08 Jan 2013 |
Entity | Veterinary Enterprises Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038571114 Company Number: 656219 |
15 Oct 1999 - 14 Aug 2007 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Donald John Maccoll - Director
Appointment date: 15 Oct 1999
Address: R D 5,, Te Awamutu, 3875 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2015
Grant Blackler - Director
Appointment date: 01 Mar 2022
Address: Rd 1, Ngaruawahia, 3281 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2022
Christopher John Mulvaney - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Oct 1999
Termination date: 03 Feb 2022
Address: R D 1, Cambridge, 3493 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2015
John Arthur Harrison - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Oct 1999
Termination date: 30 Apr 2020
Address: R D 5, Te Awamutu, 3875 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2015
Bryan Joseph Mckay - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Oct 1999
Termination date: 16 Jun 2000
Address: Te Awamutu,
Address used since 15 Oct 1999
Seald Holdings Limited
49 Benson Road
Pure Milk Mastitis Consultancy Limited
49 Benson Road
Veterinary Enterprises Group Limited
49 Benson Road
Vetent Gc Limited
49 Benson Road
Veterinaryfirst Limited
49 Benson Road
Flamewood Limited
132 Christie Avenue
Estrodevice Limited
49 Benson Road
Fieldtech Limited
49 Benson Road
Globichlor Limited
49 Benson Road
Growfarm (ip) Limited
79 Wainui Avenue
Ricky Storer Earthmoving Limited
195 Mahoe Street
Seald Holdings Limited
49 Benson Road