Ultrascan Stw Limited was launched on 21 Apr 1999 and issued a number of 9429037618230. This registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Michael John O'keeffe - an active director whose contract began on 07 Aug 2014,
Peter Grant Robinson - an inactive director whose contract began on 21 Apr 1999 and was terminated on 12 Aug 2014.
As stated in BizDb's database (updated on 19 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 480 Kaikokopu Road, Rd 1, Whanganui, 4571 (types include: registered, physical).
Up until 11 Jul 2016, Ultrascan Stw Limited had been using 609 Makirikiri Valley Road, Rd 5, Wanganui as their registered address.
BizDb identified previous aliases used by the company: from 21 Apr 1999 to 07 Aug 2014 they were named Woods Holdings Limited.
A total of 500 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 250 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
O'keeffe, Carla Robyn (an individual) located at Rd 1, Whanganui postcode 4571.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 250 shares) and includes
O'keeffe, Michael John - located at Rd 1, Whanganui.
Previous addresses
Address: 609 Makirikiri Valley Road, Rd 5, Wanganui, 4575 New Zealand
Registered address used from 21 Aug 2014 to 11 Jul 2016
Address: 180 Wicksteed Street, Wanganui, Wanganui, 4500 New Zealand
Physical address used from 12 Jul 2012 to 11 Jul 2016
Address: 180 Wicksteed Street, Wanganui, Wanganui, 4500 New Zealand
Registered address used from 12 Jul 2012 to 21 Aug 2014
Address: 19 Ridgway Street, Wanganui New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 25 May 2007 to 12 Jul 2012
Address: 19a Victoria Avenue, Wanganui
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 25 May 2007
Address: 19a Victoria Avenue, Wanganui
Physical address used from 21 Apr 1999 to 25 May 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 500
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 30 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 250 | |||
Individual | O'keeffe, Carla Robyn |
Rd 1 Whanganui 4571 New Zealand |
07 Aug 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 250 | |||
Individual | O'keeffe, Michael John |
Rd 1 Whanganui 4571 New Zealand |
07 Aug 2014 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Robinson, Peter Grant |
Wanganui New Zealand |
21 Apr 1999 - 07 Aug 2014 |
Michael John O'keeffe - Director
Appointment date: 07 Aug 2014
Address: Rd 1, Whanganui, 4571 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2016
Peter Grant Robinson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Apr 1999
Termination date: 12 Aug 2014
Address: Wanganui, 4500 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Apr 1999
The Fat Cat Company Limited
132 Blueskin
All Stitched Up Limited
424 Kaikokopu Road
John Shirley Limited
226 Blueskin Road
Blueskin Holdings Limited
306 Blueskin Road