Dhk Limited, a registered company, was registered on 31 Mar 1999. 9429037633844 is the number it was issued. "House painting" (business classification E324410) is how the company is classified. The company has been supervised by 1 director, named David Howell Cropp - an active director whose contract started on 31 Mar 1999.
Last updated on 22 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 14 Papaumu Green, Parklands, Christchurch, 8083 (type: registered, physical).
Dhk Limited had been using 1B 303 Blenheim Road, Middleton, Christchurch as their physical address until 18 Feb 2021.
A total of 400 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 200 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 100 shares (25%).
Principal place of activity
14 Papaumu Green, Parklands, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 1b 303 Blenheim Road, Middleton, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 15 Oct 2007 to 18 Feb 2021
Address #2: Hsw Limited, Level 1, 35 Mandeville Street, Riccarton, Christchurch
Physical address used from 16 Apr 2005 to 15 Oct 2007
Address #3: Hsw Limited, Level 1, 35a Mandeville Street, Riccarton, Christchurch
Registered address used from 18 Jan 2005 to 15 Oct 2007
Address #4: Scott Macdonald Accountants, 1st Floor, Ibis House, 183 Hereford Street, Christchurch
Physical address used from 30 Apr 2001 to 30 Apr 2001
Address #5: Kendons Scott Macdonald, 119 Blenheim Road, Christchurch
Physical address used from 30 Apr 2001 to 16 Apr 2005
Address #6: Scott Macdonald Accountants, 1st Floor, Ibis House, 183 Hereford Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 30 Apr 2001 to 18 Jan 2005
Address #7: Scott Macdonald Accountants, 1st Floor, Ibis House, 183 Hereford Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 30 Apr 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 400
Annual return filing month: February
Financial report filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 08 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 200 | |||
Individual | Cropp, David Howell |
Parklands Christchurch 8083 New Zealand |
31 Mar 1999 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Cropp, David Howell |
Parklands Christchurch 8083 New Zealand |
31 Mar 1999 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Cropp, Julia Anna |
Parklands Christchurch 8083 New Zealand |
07 May 2013 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Stewart, Troy Francis |
Cracroft Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
07 May 2013 - 10 Feb 2021 |
David Howell Cropp - Director
Appointment date: 31 Mar 1999
Address: Parklands, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2010
Axis Bjj Nz Limited
Unit 6b, 303 Blenheim Road
Toa Motor Limited
Unit 6b, 303 Blenheim Road
Ij Flooring Limited
Unit 6b, 303 Blenheim Road
Placement Painters Limited
Unit 3b, 303 Blenheim Road
Ashtom Limited
Unit 6b, 303 Blenheim Road
Affinity Trust Management Limited
Unit 1b, 303 Blenheim Road
D J Parkyn Painting And Decorating Limited
38 Birmingham Drive
M2 Plaster And Paint Limited
314 Riccarton Road
Metro Decorating Limited
Unit 1b 303 Blenheim Road
Qbc Interior Exteriors Limited
Unit 1b, 303 Blenheim Road
Simply Sdm Limited
314 Riccarton Road
Wilkes Painting & Contracting Limited
25 Colligan Street