Street Holdings Limited was launched on 10 Jul 1998 and issued a number of 9429037805920. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: Kenneth Wayne Street - an active director whose contract started on 10 Jul 1998,
Rex Moreton Upton - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Jul 1998 and was terminated on 30 Nov 1998,
James Lawrence Paulden - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Jul 1998 and was terminated on 10 Jul 1998.
According to BizDb's database (updated on 20 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: 329 Durham Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 (types include: registered, physical).
Until 22 May 2015, Street Holdings Limited had been using 314 Riccarton Road, Upper Riccarton, Christchurch as their physical address.
A total of 52000 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 39000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Street, Kenneth Wayne (an individual) located at Kaikoura postcode 7300.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 25% shares (exactly 13000 shares) and includes
Street, Judith Hamilton - located at Kaikoura. Street Holdings Limited was classified as "Investment operation - own account" (ANZSIC K624060).
Previous addresses
Address: 314 Riccarton Road, Upper Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 27 Jun 2013 to 22 May 2015
Address: C/o Sparks Erskine, 2nd Floor / 116 Riccarton Road, Christchurch New Zealand
Registered address used from 13 Apr 2000 to 27 Jun 2013
Address: C/o Sparks Erskine, 2nd Floor / 116 Riccarton Road, Christchurch
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 13 Apr 2000
Address: C/o Sparks Erskine, 2nd Floor / 116 Riccarton Road, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical address used from 13 Jul 1998 to 27 Jun 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 52000
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 02 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 39000 | |||
Individual | Street, Kenneth Wayne |
Kaikoura 7300 New Zealand |
10 Jul 1998 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 13000 | |||
Individual | Street, Judith Hamilton |
Kaikoura 7300 New Zealand |
10 Jul 1998 - |
Kenneth Wayne Street - Director
Appointment date: 10 Jul 1998
Address: Kaikoura, 7300 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Sep 2023
Address: St Albans, Christchurch 8014, 8014 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Feb 2016
Rex Moreton Upton - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Jul 1998
Termination date: 30 Nov 1998
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 10 Jul 1998
James Lawrence Paulden - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Jul 1998
Termination date: 10 Jul 1998
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 10 Jul 1998
Jka Trustees Limited
329 Durham Street
Tavendale Trustees Limited
329 Durham Street
Caseley Trustees Limited
329 Durham Street
S&k Molloy Trustees Limited
329 Durham Street
Robbie Larkin Trustees Limited
329 Durham Street
Trustee 016131 Limited
329 Durham Street
Chessus Investments Limited
Ashton Wheelans & Hegan Limited
Environment Kapiti Limited
Level 1, 311 Manchester Street
Gargiulo Investments Limited
Flat 11, 75 Gloucester Street
Goldzilla Investments Limited
1/77 Gloucester Street
K.d.f.m. Limited
C/- 8 Nyoli Street
Taitapu Partners Limited
151 Cambridge Terrace