Quality Family Healthcare Limited, a registered company, was registered on 13 Jul 1998. 9429037821364 is the NZ business number it was issued. "General practitioner - medical" (ANZSIC Q851120) is how the company was categorised. This company has been run by 2 directors: Peter Conyers Crosland - an active director whose contract started on 13 Jul 1998,
Christina Marie Therese Sawicki - an active director whose contract started on 13 Jul 1998.
Updated on 05 Sep 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 4 Huntleigh Park Way, Ngaio, Wellington, 6035 (types include: postal, office).
Quality Family Healthcare Limited had been using 6 Aylesbury Way, Karori, Wellington as their physical address up to 28 Nov 2016.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 999 shares (99.9%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (0.1%).
Principal place of activity
4 Huntleigh Park Way, Ngaio, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 6 Aylesbury Way, Karori, Wellington, 6012 New Zealand
Physical address used from 14 Sep 2007 to 28 Nov 2016
Address #2: 6 Aylesbury Way, Karori, Wellington, 6012 New Zealand
Registered address used from 14 Sep 2007 to 29 Nov 2016
Address #3: Kopata Medical Centre, 60-62 Bloomfield Terrace, Lower Hutt
Physical address used from 21 Aug 2003 to 14 Sep 2007
Address #4: Level 13, 80 The Terrace, Axa Centre, Wellington
Physical address used from 01 Sep 2001 to 21 Aug 2003
Address #5: Level 3, Cmc Building, 89 Courtenay Place, Wellington
Physical address used from 01 Sep 2001 to 01 Sep 2001
Address #6: Kopata Medical Centre, 60-62 Bloomfield Terrace, Lower Hutt
Physical address used from 03 Oct 2000 to 01 Sep 2001
Address #7: Kopata Medical Centre, 60-62 Bloomfield Terrace, Lower Hutt
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 14 Sep 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 06 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 999 | |||
Individual | Crosland, Peter Conyers |
Ngaio Wellington 6035 New Zealand |
13 Jul 1998 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Sawicki, Christina Marie Therese |
Ngaio Wellington 6035 New Zealand |
13 Jul 1998 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Sawicki, Christina Marie Therese |
Karori Wellington |
24 Nov 2005 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Crosland, Peter Conyers |
Karori Wellington |
24 Nov 2005 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Garstang, Colin Anthony |
Masterton |
24 Nov 2005 - 24 Nov 2005 |
Peter Conyers Crosland - Director
Appointment date: 13 Jul 1998
Address: Ngaio, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Nov 2016
Christina Marie Therese Sawicki - Director
Appointment date: 13 Jul 1998
Address: Ngaio, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Nov 2016
Datagenix Limited
103 Heke Street
Seblot Limited
17 Huntleigh Park Way
C F Mccallum Limited
14 Huntleigh Park Way
Sf Pro Services Limited
87 Heke Street
Jofullelove Limited
87 Heke Street
Esteem Technology Limited
85 Heke Street
Alcandoo Limited
4 Kabul St
Charlotte Health Limited
65 Orangi Kaupapa Road
David Hingston Medical Limited
85 Heke Street
Midland Park Medical Limited
Level 2, 190 Lambton Quay
Ngarongoa Limited
3 Middlesex Place
Turner Medical Limited
54 Homewood Crescent