Gilgit Trust Limited, a registered company, was registered on 03 Nov 1997. 9429037974749 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. The company has been run by 2 directors: Murray Johansen - an active director whose contract started on 03 Nov 1997,
Grant Ian Hally - an active director whose contract started on 03 Nov 1997.
Updated on 29 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: Rsm House, Level 2, 62 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 (types include: registered, physical).
Gilgit Trust Limited had been using Level 2, Rsm House, 60 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland as their registered address up to 02 Mar 2020.
All company shares (100 shares exactly) are in the hands of a single group consisting of 2 entities, namely:
Hally, Grant Ian (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050,
Johansen, Murray (an individual) located at Albany, Auckland postcode 0632.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 2, Rsm House, 60 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 Oct 2019 to 02 Mar 2020
Address: Level 2, Building 5, 60 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, 2013 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 28 May 2018 to 04 Oct 2019
Address: Ford Building, 86 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, 2013 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 Feb 2011 to 28 May 2018
Address: Level 9, 50 Anzac Avenue, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 10 Jun 2009 to 17 Feb 2011
Address: C/- Prince & Partners, Reserve Bank Building, Level 5, 67 Customs Str East, Auckland
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 10 Jun 2009
Address: C/- Prince & Partners, Reserve Bank Building, Level 5, 67 Customs Str East, Auckland
Physical address used from 17 Jun 1998 to 17 Jun 1998
Address: C/- Prince & Partners, Reserve Bank Building, Level 5, 67 Customs Str East, Auckland
Registered address used from 17 Jun 1998 to 12 Apr 2000
Address: C/-prince & Partners, Custom House, Level Nine, 50 Anzac Ave, Auckland
Physical address used from 17 Jun 1998 to 10 Jun 2009
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 26 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Hally, Grant Ian |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
03 Nov 1997 - |
Individual | Johansen, Murray |
Albany Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
03 Nov 1997 - |
Murray Johansen - Director
Appointment date: 03 Nov 1997
Address: Albany, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jun 2015
Grant Ian Hally - Director
Appointment date: 03 Nov 1997
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2012
My Tax Back Nz Limited
Ford Building
Raymond Abel Dental Limited
Ford Building
Sebo Limited
Unit 12, 13 Highbrook Drive
Oldco Limited
Unit 2, 13 Highbrook Drive
Ford Motor Company Of New Zealand Limited
Level 2, The Ford Building
Ftl Securities Limited
Level 1 21 El Kobar Drive