Kerswell Holdings Limited, a registered company, was registered on 25 Nov 1996. 9429038192937 is the number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 3 directors: Jack Lee Porus - an active director whose contract started on 25 May 2007,
Robert Narev - an inactive director whose contract started on 02 Apr 1997 and was terminated on 25 May 2007,
Deidre Elizabeth Norris - an inactive director whose contract started on 25 Nov 1996 and was terminated on 02 Apr 1997.
Kerswell Holdings Limited had been using Offices Of Glaister Ennor, Norfolk House, 18 High Street, Auckland as their registered address until 16 Jul 2007.
Previous addresses
Address: Offices Of Glaister Ennor, Norfolk House, 18 High Street, Auckland
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 16 Jul 2007
Address: Level 2, Ferry Building, 99 Quay Street, Auckland
Physical address used from 06 Apr 1998 to 16 Jul 2007
Address: Level 7, 47-49 Fort Street, Auckland
Physical address used from 06 Apr 1998 to 06 Apr 1998
Address: Offices Of Glaister Ennor, Norfolk House, 18 High Street, Auckland
Registered address used from 23 Jan 1998 to 11 Apr 2000
Address: Offices Of Glaister Ennor, Norfolk House, 18 High Street, Auckland
Physical address used from 11 Sep 1997 to 06 Apr 1998
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 11 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Porus, Jack Lee |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
11 Jul 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Narev, Robert |
Okahu Bay Auckland |
06 Jul 2007 - 09 Jul 2007 |
Individual | Narev, Robert |
Okahu Bay Auckland |
25 Nov 1996 - 06 Jul 2007 |
Jack Lee Porus - Director
Appointment date: 25 May 2007
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2021
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 25 May 2007
Robert Narev - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Apr 1997
Termination date: 25 May 2007
Address: Okahu Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 02 Apr 1997
Deidre Elizabeth Norris - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Nov 1996
Termination date: 02 Apr 1997
Address: Ponsonby, Auckland,
Address used since 25 Nov 1996
Windhaven Taxi Holdings Limited
Level 3, The Ferry Building
Organic Blooms Nz Limited
761a State Highway 1
C R P Limited
Level 9, 2 Emily Place
Ready Finance Limited
Level 9, 2 Emily Place
Thomas Rowe Family Trustee (no 2) Limited
Level 7, 38 Wyndham Street
360 Discovery Limited
111 Quay Street