Pc Central Limited, a registered company, was registered on 22 Jul 1996. 9429038271113 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Computer consultancy service" (ANZSIC M700010) is how the company has been categorised. The company has been managed by 3 directors: Ewen Graham Livingstone - an active director whose contract began on 27 Mar 2002,
Ian Geddes - an inactive director whose contract began on 26 Apr 2002 and was terminated on 29 Jan 2009,
Paul Gerard Livingstone - an inactive director whose contract began on 22 Jul 1996 and was terminated on 27 Mar 2002.
Updated on 25 Jul 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: Po Box 3233, Hawkes Bay Mail Center, Onekawa, Napier, 4142 (types include: postal, office).
Pc Central Limited had been using 1 Puketapu Road, Taradale, Napier as their physical address up until 07 Apr 2006.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Pc Central Limited - located at 4142, Greenmeadows, Napier.
Principal place of activity
10a Burness Road, Greenmeadows, Napier, 4112 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 1 Puketapu Road, Taradale, Napier
Physical address used from 16 May 2001 to 07 Apr 2006
Address #2: Level 1, 1 Puketapu Road, Taradale, Napier
Physical address used from 16 May 2001 to 16 May 2001
Address #3: Level 1, 1 Puketapu Road, Taradale, Napier
Registered address used from 04 May 2000 to 07 Apr 2006
Address #4: Level 1, 1 Puketapu Road, Taradale, Napier
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 04 May 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 23 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Pc Central Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038271113 |
Greenmeadows Napier |
22 Jul 1996 - |
Ewen Graham Livingstone - Director
Appointment date: 27 Mar 2002
Address: Greenmeadows, Napier, 4112 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Mar 2002
Ian Geddes - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Apr 2002
Termination date: 29 Jan 2009
Address: Tamatea, Napier,
Address used since 26 Apr 2002
Paul Gerard Livingstone - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Jul 1996
Termination date: 27 Mar 2002
Address: Tamatea, Napier,
Address used since 22 Jul 1996
Nga Manu Kura O Tairawhiti Trust
20a Burness Road
Hawkes Bay Environment Education Trust
22 Burness Road
Artworks Engineering & Building Limited
98 Guppy Road
Reigncare Trust
99 Guppy Road
Closed Loop Environmental Solutions New Zealand Limited
105 Guppy Road
Unidex Consulting Pty Ltd
105 Guppy Road
Devereux It Limited
27 Avondale Road
Ibc Limited
20 Cambridge Terrace
Iot Nz - Internet Of Things Technologies Limited
9 Peddie Street
Rhythm It Limited
5 Holyrood Street
Ultraflex Technologies Limited
3 Neagle Place
Xyz Computers Limited
157 Tait Drive