Ffp Nelson Marlborough Fire Limited, a registered company, was launched on 06 Jun 1996. 9429038303098 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. This company has been run by 5 directors: Julie Malthus - an active director whose contract began on 06 Jun 1996,
Simon John Malthus - an inactive director whose contract began on 06 Jun 1996 and was terminated on 14 Aug 2024,
Graham Eric Horwarth - an inactive director whose contract began on 06 Jun 1996 and was terminated on 15 Jan 2004,
Lynda Horwarth - an inactive director whose contract began on 03 Dec 2003 and was terminated on 15 Jan 2004,
Andrew David Buchanan - an inactive director whose contract began on 06 Jun 1996 and was terminated on 30 Mar 2003.
Updated on 12 Sep 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 12C Wakapuaka Road, Rd 1, Nelson, 7071 (type: registered, service).
Ffp Nelson Marlborough Fire Limited had been using Level 1, 47 Bridge Street, Nelson as their physical address up to 15 Jun 2020.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 10000 shares) - Malthus, Julie - located at 7071, Nelson.
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 1, 47 Bridge Street, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 28 Feb 2014 to 15 Jun 2020
Address #2: Carran Miller Strawbridge Ltd, 3rd Floor, Clifford House, 38 Halifax Street, Nelson 7010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 21 May 2010 to 28 Feb 2014
Address #3: Level 3, Landsborough House, Cnr Durham & Gloucester Sts, Christchurch
Registered address used from 08 May 2001 to 21 May 2010
Address #4: Level 3, Landsborough House, Cnr Durham & Gloucester Sts, Christchurch
Physical address used from 08 May 2001 to 08 May 2001
Address #5: 3rd Floor Clifford House, Nelson
Physical address used from 08 May 2001 to 21 May 2010
Address #6: Goldsmith Fox P K F, 236 Armagh Street, Christchurch
Registered & physical address used from 08 Jun 2000 to 08 May 2001
Address #7: Goldsmith Fox P K F, 236 Armagh Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 08 Jun 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 20000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 19 May 2020
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 10000 | |||
Individual | Malthus, Julie |
Nelson 7010 New Zealand |
28 May 2004 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Malthus, Simon John |
Nelson 7010 New Zealand |
28 May 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Malthus, Simon John |
Nelson 7010 New Zealand |
28 May 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Entity | Pyro-tech Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039025890 Company Number: 533690 |
28 May 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Entity | Pyro-tech Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039025890 Company Number: 533690 |
28 May 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Julie Malthus - Director
Appointment date: 06 Jun 1996
Address: Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 May 2013
Simon John Malthus - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Jun 1996
Termination date: 14 Aug 2024
Address: Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 May 2013
Graham Eric Horwarth - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Jun 1996
Termination date: 15 Jan 2004
Address: Hanmer Springs,
Address used since 03 Dec 2003
Lynda Horwarth - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Dec 2003
Termination date: 15 Jan 2004
Address: Hanmer Springs,
Address used since 03 Dec 2003
Andrew David Buchanan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Jun 1996
Termination date: 30 Mar 2003
Address: Ashley,
Address used since 06 Jun 1996
Espebe Equities Limited
Level 1, 126 Trafalgar Street
Tinline Properties (tauranga) Limited
Level 1, 126 Trafalgar Street
Tinline Limited
Level 1, 126 Trafalgar Street
Are (nz) Limited
Level 1 47 Bridge Street
W E & M J Stevens Limited
Level 1, 126 Trafalgar Street
Fvm Trustees (no. 3) Limited
Level 2, 105 Collingwood Street