Uptime New Zealand Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 30 May 1996. 9429038322396 is the business number it was issued. "Computer consultancy service" (business classification M700010) is how the company has been classified. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Paul David Steffensen - an active director whose contract began on 30 May 1996,
Charles Ray Moore Ii - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 May 1996 and was terminated on 19 Jan 2004.
Last updated on 18 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 4/189 Portland Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 (types include: physical, service).
Uptime New Zealand Limited had been using 5 Olea Road, Onehunga, Auckland as their registered address until 17 Dec 2014.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Steffensen, Paul David - located at 1050, Remuera, Auckland.
Principal place of activity
4/189 Portland Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 5 Olea Road, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Registered address used from 29 Nov 2012 to 17 Dec 2014
Address #2: 4/189 Portland Road, Remuera, Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 08 May 2008 to 08 Dec 2021
Address #3: 11b Burrows Avenue, Parnell, Auckland
Physical address used from 12 Sep 2007 to 08 May 2008
Address #4: 101 Main Highway, Ellerslie, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 14 Nov 2003 to 29 Nov 2012
Address #5: 81 Potts Road, Whitford, Auckland
Physical address used from 14 Nov 2003 to 12 Sep 2007
Address #6: Level 11, Shortland Tower One, 51-53 Shortland Street, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 19 Jul 2002 to 14 Nov 2003
Address #7: C/- Bertelsen Harry, Chartered, Accountants Level 1, Bldg 5, Central, Park, 666 Great South Rd, Auckland
Registered address used from 04 Dec 2001 to 19 Jul 2002
Address #8: Bertelsen Harry Chtd Accts, Level 1 Bldg 5 Central Park, 666 Gt Sth Rd, Auckland
Physical address used from 04 Dec 2001 to 04 Dec 2001
Address #9: Level 1, Building 5, 666 Great South Road, Central Park, Penrose, Auckland
Physical address used from 04 Dec 2001 to 19 Jul 2002
Address #10: C/- Nigel Smith & Associates, Level 9, 115 Queen Street, Auckland
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 04 Dec 2001
Address #11: C/- Nigel Smith & Associates, Level 9, 115 Queen Street, Auckland
Registered address used from 28 Oct 1999 to 11 Apr 2000
Address #12: C/- Nigel Smith & Associates, Level 9, 115 Queen Street, Auckland
Physical address used from 28 Oct 1999 to 04 Dec 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 08 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Steffensen, Paul David |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
30 May 1996 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Moore Ii, Charles Ray |
Coatesville Rd3 Albany |
30 May 1996 - 10 Nov 2004 |
Paul David Steffensen - Director
Appointment date: 30 May 1996
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Nov 2015
Charles Ray Moore Ii - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 May 1996
Termination date: 19 Jan 2004
Address: Coatesville Rd 3, Albany,
Address used since 30 May 1996
Dba Services Limited
4/189 Portland Road
Hari Om Trustee Limited
3 Stirling Street
Hari Om Sai Holdings Limited
3 Stirling Street
Shiv Om Trustee Limited
3 Stirling Street
Jayesh Patel Anaesthetic Services Limited
3 Stirling Street
Promat Group Limited
12 Stirling Street
Aspirants Limited
6 Wiles Avenue
Axin Global Limited
22b Wiles Avenue
Brother And Brothers Limited
17 Mahoe Avenue
Dba Services Limited
4/189 Portland Road
Dw Design Limited
30 Bell Road
Pirsquared Limited
3c Walton Street