The Worlds Greatest Salesman Limited was launched on 28 Nov 1995 and issued a business number of 9429038533204. This registered LTD company has been managed by 6 directors: Nicholas Scott Rowney - an active director whose contract began on 23 Oct 1996,
Lorraine Rowlands - an active director whose contract began on 23 Jun 2006,
Scott Aidan Harens - an inactive director whose contract began on 23 Oct 1996 and was terminated on 02 Aug 1999,
Noel Donald Sulzberger - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Nov 1996 and was terminated on 31 Oct 1997,
Martin Ross Macdonald - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Nov 1996 and was terminated on 31 Oct 1997.
As stated in BizDb's information (updated on 03 Aug 2024), the company filed 1 address: 202 Caveland Road, Rd 4, Gladstone, 5884 (category: physical, registered).
Until 15 Dec 2020, The Worlds Greatest Salesman Limited had been using 12 Earn Place, Southgate, Wellington as their registered address.
BizDb identified former names used by the company: from 05 Nov 1996 to 10 May 2018 they were named Wild Ideas (Nz) Limited, from 28 Nov 1995 to 05 Nov 1996 they were named Wingate Resources Limited.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Rowney, Nicholas Scott (an individual) located at Rd4, Masterton postcode 5884.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Rowlands, Lorraine - located at Rd4, Masterton. The Worlds Greatest Salesman Limited has been classified as "Sales advisory service" (ANZSIC M696285).
Principal place of activity
202 Caveland Road, Rd 4, Gladstone, 5884 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 12 Earn Place, Southgate, Wellington, 6023 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Dec 2013 to 15 Dec 2020
Address #2: 28 Mills Road, Brooklyn, Wellington New Zealand
Registered address used from 29 Nov 2001 to 16 Dec 2013
Address #3: C/-gilbert Swan, Barristers & Solicitors, Level 12, Microsoft House, 49 Boulcott Street, Wellington
Registered address used from 29 Nov 2001 to 29 Nov 2001
Address #4: 28 Mills Road, Brooklyn, Wellington New Zealand
Physical address used from 23 Jan 1998 to 16 Dec 2013
Address #5: 3rd Floor, 21-29 Broderick Road, Johnsonville, Wellington
Physical address used from 23 Jan 1998 to 23 Jan 1998
Address #6: Gilbert Swan, Barristers & Solicitors, Level 12, Microsoft House, 49 Boulcott Street, Wellington
Physical address used from 23 Jan 1998 to 23 Jan 1998
Address #7: 3rd Floor, 21-29 Broderick Road, Johnsonville, Wellington
Registered address used from 12 Dec 1997 to 29 Nov 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 06 Dec 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Rowney, Nicholas Scott |
Rd4 Masterton 5884 New Zealand |
28 Nov 1995 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Rowlands, Lorraine |
Rd4 Masterton 5884 New Zealand |
23 Jun 2006 - |
Nicholas Scott Rowney - Director
Appointment date: 23 Oct 1996
Address: Rd 4, Gladstone, 5884 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Dec 2020
Address: Southgate, Wellington, 6023 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Dec 2013
Lorraine Rowlands - Director
Appointment date: 23 Jun 2006
Address: Rd 4, Gladstone, 5884 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Dec 2020
Address: Southgate, Wellington, 6023 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Dec 2013
Scott Aidan Harens - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Oct 1996
Termination date: 02 Aug 1999
Address: Miramar, Wellington,
Address used since 23 Oct 1996
Noel Donald Sulzberger - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Nov 1996
Termination date: 31 Oct 1997
Address: Karori, Wellington,
Address used since 01 Nov 1996
Martin Ross Macdonald - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Nov 1996
Termination date: 31 Oct 1997
Address: Tawa, Wellington,
Address used since 01 Nov 1996
Garth Osmond Melville - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Nov 1995
Termination date: 23 Oct 1996
Address: Freemans Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 28 Nov 1995
Balavy Consulting Limited
25b Orchy Crescent
Floorballshop Limited
1 Earn Place
Wellington Floorball Club Incorporated
1 Earn Place
Floorball New Zealand Incorporated
1 Earn Place
Entrance Group Limited
17 Orchy Crescent
Accident Compensation And Levy Payment Support Limited
30 Orchy Crescent
Central Drywall Services Limited
60 Ashton Fitchett Drive
Data Vision Technology Limited
Taranaki Street
Focan Limited
22 Whaui Street
Paterson - Smith Limited
64 Frobisher Street
Simply Selling International Limited
10 Jordan Street
The Merchant Class Limited
110 Cuba Street