Zoom Project & Design Limited, a registered company, was launched on 23 Feb 1993. 9429038783265 is the number it was issued. "Wholesale trade nec" (ANZSIC F373970) is how the company was classified. The company has been managed by 3 directors: Nicholas John Hall - an active director whose contract started on 23 Feb 1993,
Kelly Ann Hall - an active director whose contract started on 23 Feb 1993,
Munro Sydney Hall - an active director whose contract started on 07 Nov 2021.
Updated on 06 Sep 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: P.o Box 17597, Sumner, Christchurch, 8081 (category: postal, office).
Zoom Project & Design Limited had been using 1020 Ferry Road, Christchurch as their registered address up until 22 Nov 2017.
Previous aliases used by the company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 31 Aug 1995 to 28 Jul 1999 they were named Cuisine Card Canterbury Limited, from 23 Feb 1993 to 31 Aug 1995 they were named Cuisine Card Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders (4 groups). The first group includes 58 shares (58 per cent) held by 2 entities. There is also a second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (1 per cent). Lastly we have the 3rd share allotment (1 share 1 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
152 Wordsworth Street, Sydenham, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 1020 Ferry Road, Christchurch New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 21 Oct 2009 to 22 Nov 2017
Address #2: 5/1027 Ferry Road, Christchurch
Registered & physical address used from 06 Oct 2006 to 21 Oct 2009
Address #3: 141 Taylors Mistake Road, Christchurch 8008
Registered address used from 04 Dec 2000 to 06 Oct 2006
Address #4: 141taylors Mistake Road, Christchurch 8008
Physical address used from 04 Dec 2000 to 04 Dec 2000
Address #5: 131taylors Mistake Road, Christchurch 8008
Physical address used from 04 Dec 2000 to 06 Oct 2006
Address #6: 89a Heberden Avenue, Sumner, Christchurch
Registered address used from 15 Apr 1998 to 04 Dec 2000
Address #7: 89a Heberden Avenue, Sumner, Christchurch
Physical address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 04 Dec 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 01 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 58 | |||
Individual | Hall, Nicholas John |
Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
23 Feb 1993 - |
Individual | Hall, Kelly Ann |
Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
23 Feb 1993 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Hall, Kelly Ann |
Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
23 Feb 1993 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Hall, Nicholas John |
Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
23 Feb 1993 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 40 | |||
Individual | Hall, Munro Sydney |
Scarborough Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
07 Nov 2021 - |
Nicholas John Hall - Director
Appointment date: 23 Feb 1993
Address: Scarborough, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Nov 2015
Kelly Ann Hall - Director
Appointment date: 23 Feb 1993
Address: Scarborough, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Nov 2015
Munro Sydney Hall - Director
Appointment date: 07 Nov 2021
Address: Scarborough, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Nov 2021
Mailhq Limited
1020 Ferry Road
Sidera Construction Limited
1016 Ferry Road
Amco Limited
Unit 6b
Orange Studio Limited
Unit 3, 1063 Ferry Road
Party World (nz) Limited
1063 Ferry Road
Casual And Country Limited
1027 Ferry Road
Boomfa Limited
15 Waterman Place
D. B-s. International Limited
4 Santa Maria Avenue
Oc Bristo International Limited
3a, 3 Tussock Lane
Quinn Homes Limited
91 Major Hornbrook Road
Ssa Christchurch Limited
80 Rutherford Street
The Trigger Limited
15 Waterman Place