Milford Airport Limited, a registered company, was started on 28 May 1992. 9429038991448 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 6 directors: Paul Trevor Dentice - an active director whose contract began on 30 Oct 1993,
David William Greenslade - an active director whose contract began on 20 Oct 2017,
John Michael Pope - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Oct 1993 and was terminated on 20 Oct 2017,
Maurice Desmond Hayes - an inactive director whose contract began on 28 May 1992 and was terminated on 30 Oct 1993,
Peter Hamilton Scott - an inactive director whose contract began on 28 May 1992 and was terminated on 30 Oct 1993.
Last updated on 25 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 4, Bayleys Building, 36 Brandon Street, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, physical).
Milford Airport Limited had been using Level 4, Bayleys Building, 28 Brandon Street, Wellington as their registered address until 12 Oct 2011.
A total of 3 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 1 share (33.33 per cent) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 2 shares (66.67 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: Level 4, Bayleys Building, 28 Brandon Street, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 Oct 2010 to 12 Oct 2011
Address: Macalister Mazengarb, 7th Floor, Laptop House, 23 Waring Taylor Street, Wellington New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 23 Oct 2003 to 20 Oct 2010
Address: Macalister Mazengarb Perry Castle, 7th Floor, Baillieu House, 23 Waring Taylor Street, Wellington
Physical address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 23 Oct 2003
Address: Level 8 Wakefield House, 90 The Terrace, Wellington
Registered address used from 11 Jul 1995 to 23 Oct 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 3
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 02 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Greenslade, David William |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 New Zealand |
20 Oct 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 2 | |||
Individual | Dentice, Paul Trevor |
Te Aro Wellington New Zealand |
28 May 1992 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Pope, John Michael |
Khandallah Wellington |
28 May 1992 - 20 Oct 2017 |
Paul Trevor Dentice - Director
Appointment date: 30 Oct 1993
Address: Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Oct 2009
David William Greenslade - Director
Appointment date: 20 Oct 2017
Address: Kelburn, Wellington, 6012 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Oct 2017
John Michael Pope - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Oct 1993
Termination date: 20 Oct 2017
Address: Woburn, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Oct 2015
Maurice Desmond Hayes - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 May 1992
Termination date: 30 Oct 1993
Address: Papakura, Auckland,
Address used since 28 May 1992
Peter Hamilton Scott - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 May 1992
Termination date: 30 Oct 1993
Address: Lowry Bay, Eastbourne, Wellington,
Address used since 28 May 1992
Erne Joyce - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 May 1992
Termination date: 30 Oct 1993
Address: Khandallah, Wellington,
Address used since 28 May 1992
Prada New Zealand Limited
Level 7
Retail Works Limited
Level 7, The Bayleys Building
Total Tiedowns Limited
Level 7, The Bayleys Building
Graphic Packaging International New Zealand Limited
Level 7, The Bayleys Building
Lcb Management Nz Limited
Level 7