Geoff Wilson Engineering Limited, a registered company, was launched on 01 Oct 1990. 9429039189851 is the business number it was issued. "Machinery repair and maintenance nec" (business classification S942927) is how the company was categorised. The company has been run by 3 directors: Geoffrey Louis Wilson - an active director whose contract started on 01 Oct 1990,
Evelyn May Wilson - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Oct 1990 and was terminated on 25 Jul 2008,
Paul William Fallow - an inactive director whose contract started on 25 Nov 1991 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2000.
Last updated on 20 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 486 Two Chain Road, Rd 7, Christchurch, 7677 (types include: postal, office).
Geoff Wilson Engineering Limited had been using Frankton Industrial Estate, Frankton, Queenstown as their registered address up to 13 Jun 2001.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 10000 shares) - Wilson, Geoffrey Louis - located at 7677, Rd 7, Christchurch.
Principal place of activity
486 Two Chain Road, Rd 7, Christchurch, 7677 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Frankton Industrial Estate, Frankton, Queenstown
Registered address used from 13 Jun 2001 to 13 Jun 2001
Address #2: 36 Dalefield Road, Frankton, Queenstown New Zealand
Registered address used from 13 Jun 2001 to 11 Sep 2013
Address #3: Frankton Industrial Estate, Frankton, Queenstown
Physical address used from 05 Jun 2001 to 05 Jun 2001
Address #4: 36 Dalefield Road, Frankton, Queenstown New Zealand
Physical address used from 05 Jun 2001 to 11 Sep 2013
Address #5: 6 Industrial Place, Queenstown
Registered address used from 22 Jun 1994 to 13 Jun 2001
Address #6: Same As Registered Office Address
Physical address used from 21 Feb 1992 to 21 Feb 1992
Address #7: -
Physical address used from 21 Feb 1992 to 21 Feb 1992
Address #8: 76 Thames Street, Oamaru
Registered address used from 02 Dec 1991 to 22 Jun 1994
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 25 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 10000 | |||
Individual | Wilson, Geoffrey Louis |
Rd 7 Christchurch 7677 New Zealand |
01 Oct 1990 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Wilson, Elelyn May |
Queenstown |
01 Oct 1990 - 28 Jul 2008 |
Geoffrey Louis Wilson - Director
Appointment date: 01 Oct 1990
Address: Rd 7, Christchurch, 7677 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Sep 2013
Evelyn May Wilson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Oct 1990
Termination date: 25 Jul 2008
Address: Queenstown,
Address used since 01 Oct 1990
Paul William Fallow - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Nov 1991
Termination date: 31 Mar 2000
Address: Alexandra,
Address used since 25 Nov 1991
Canterbury Dry Firewood Limited
37kerrs Road
Greenzone Living Limited
37 Kerrs Road
Boiler And Burner Servicing Limited
10 Mondrian Lane
Burnett Construction Limited
43 Springston Rolleston Road
Herculeanz Limited
15 Sioux Avenue
Hydrafast Limited
449 Grange Road
Onsite Maintenance And Engineering Limited
156 Brookside Road
Southtec Services Limited
30 Beaumont Drive