Winshare Trading Limited, a registered company, was registered on 27 Apr 1989. 9429039333056 is the business number it was issued. "Stockbroking or trading" (ANZSIC K641130) is how the company is categorised. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Douglas Mark Peat - an active director whose contract began on 30 Apr 1991,
Eva Irmtraud Peat - an active director whose contract began on 18 May 2000.
Updated on 29 Oct 2020, our database contains detailed information about 2 addresses the company registered, namely: 36 Wyndrum Ave, Waterloo, Lower Hutt, Wellington (physical address),
36 Wyndrum Ave, Waterloo, Lower Hutt, Wellington (registered address),
36 Wyndrum Ave, Waterloo, Lower Hutt, Wellington (other address).
Winshare Trading Limited had been using 30 Burnside Street, Lower Hutt, Wellington as their registered address up until 26 May 2006.
Former names for the company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 27 Apr 1989 to 07 Jul 1999 they were called Roberts, Rosegger & Field Limited.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 4 shareholders (4 groups). The first group consists of 10 shares (10%) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 33 shares (33%). Finally there is the 3rd share allotment (10 shares 10%) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
36 Wyndrum Ave, Waterloo, Lower Hutt, Wellington, 5011 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: 30 Burnside Street, Lower Hutt, Wellington
Registered & physical address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 26 May 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 10 Jun 2020
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Sherwin James Peat |
Lower Hutt Wellington 5011 New Zealand |
27 Apr 1989 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 33 | |||
Individual | Eva Irmtraud Peat |
Lower Hutt Wellington 5011 New Zealand |
27 Apr 1989 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Jeremy Luke Peat |
Lower Hutt Wellington 5011 New Zealand |
27 Apr 1989 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 47 | |||
Individual | Douglas Mark Peat |
Lower Hutt Wellington 5011 New Zealand |
27 Apr 1989 - |
Douglas Mark Peat - Director
Appointment date: 30 Apr 1991
Address: Waterloo, Lower Hutt, 5011 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Jun 2010
Eva Irmtraud Peat - Director
Appointment date: 18 May 2000
Address: Waterloo, Lower Hutt, 5011 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Jun 2010
Strictly Nissan Limited
Flat 3, 342 Riverside Drive North
Gfsd Limited
16a Wyndrum Avenue
Gale Force Gospel Choir Incorporated
7 Wyndrum Avenue
Pj Walker Management Limited
31 Norton Park Avenue
Merf Holdings Limited
96 Norton Park Grove
Ezzysoft Solutions Limited
50a Norton Park Avenue
Eefatt Trading Limited
19 St Edmund Crescent
Fennxi International Trading Limited
5 Ashwood Street
Gm Capital Management Limited
11 Chastudon Place
Smartwin Energy Trading Limited
41 Huanui Street
Sri Sai Sri Propertiess Limited
2 Kahikatea Grove
Youtrade Co Limited
5a Epuni Street