Newturn Commercial Interiors Limited, a registered company, was launched on 19 May 1988. 9429039452306 is the number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 3 directors: Adrian Hooft - an active director whose contract started on 29 Apr 1992,
William H Woodbridge - an inactive director whose contract started on 29 Apr 1992 and was terminated on 29 Jul 1999,
Philip R Bond - an inactive director whose contract started on 29 Apr 1992 and was terminated on 23 Mar 1993.
Updated on 14 Sep 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 4 addresses this company registered, specifically: Unit 210 14 Edgewater Drive, Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 (registered address),
Unit 210 14 Edgewater Drive, Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 (service address),
29 Dulwich Place, Burswood, Auckland, 2013 (physical address),
29 Dulwich Place, Burswood, Auckland, 2013 (service address) among others.
Newturn Commercial Interiors Limited had been using 2 Mazzola Way, Avalon, Lower Hutt as their physical address until 15 Apr 2021.
Past names for this company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 19 May 1988 to 28 Apr 1993 they were named New Turn Industries Limited.
A total of 3000 shares are issued to 3 shareholders (3 groups). The first group consists of 1000 shares (33.33 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 1000 shares (33.33 per cent). Finally we have the 3rd share allocation (1000 shares 33.33 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Other active addresses
Address #4: Unit 210 14 Edgewater Drive, Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 19 Jun 2023
Principal place of activity
29 Dulwich Place, Pakuranga, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 2 Mazzola Way, Avalon, Lower Hutt, 5011 New Zealand
Physical address used from 29 Apr 2020 to 15 Apr 2021
Address #2: 7 Akron Grove, Lower Hutt
Registered address used from 10 Aug 1999 to 10 Aug 1999
Address #3: 127 Queens Drive, Lower Hutt
Registered address used from 19 May 1992 to 10 Aug 1999
Address #4: 7 Akron Grove, Lower Hutt, Wellington New Zealand
Physical address used from 20 Feb 1992 to 29 Apr 2020
Address #5: -
Physical address used from 20 Feb 1992 to 20 Feb 1992
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 3000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 13 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Hooft, Adrian |
East Tamaki Auckland |
19 May 1988 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Bond, Philip R |
Lower Hutt |
19 May 1988 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Woodbridge, William H |
Avalon Lower Hutt 5011 New Zealand |
19 May 1988 - |
Adrian Hooft - Director
Appointment date: 29 Apr 1992
Address: Pakuranga, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Apr 2016
William H Woodbridge - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Apr 1992
Termination date: 29 Jul 1999
Address: Upper Hutt,
Address used since 29 Apr 1992
Philip R Bond - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Apr 1992
Termination date: 23 Mar 1993
Address: Lower Hutt,
Address used since 29 Apr 1992
Designport Consulting Engineers Limited
22g Torrens Road
New Health Products Limited
22c Torrens Road
Fly Express Limited
22c Torrens Road
An Luan Trading Limited
20l Torrens Road
Fulink Electronics Limited
Unit 7, 28 Torrens Road
Sosimple Limited
Unit 12, 28 Torrens Road