A-Z Rigging and Scaffolding Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 13 Nov 1987. 9429039538031 is the NZBN it was issued. The company has been supervised by 4 directors: Dudley Rex Hoskin - an active director whose contract began on 31 May 2001,
Zak Hoskin - an inactive director whose contract began on 25 Aug 2011 and was terminated on 01 Jul 2014,
Susan Jacqulyn Cook - an inactive director whose contract began on 12 Feb 1991 and was terminated on 01 Jun 2011,
Scott William Forsyth - an inactive director whose contract began on 12 Feb 1991 and was terminated on 31 May 2001.
Updated on 21 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 61 Higgins Road, Hamilton (types include: registered, physical).
A-Z Rigging and Scaffolding Limited had been using 293 Kahikatea Drive, Hamilton as their registered address until 21 Feb 2006.
Old names for this company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 15 Jan 2001 to 29 Sep 2010 they were called Scaffolding and Formwork (N.z.) Limited, from 13 Nov 1987 to 15 Jan 2001 they were called Cook and Forsyth Limited.
A total of 50000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders (3 groups). The first group is comprised of 1000 shares (2%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 19000 shares (38%). Finally there is the next share allotment (30000 shares 60%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address: 293 Kahikatea Drive, Hamilton
Registered address used from 31 Mar 2001 to 21 Feb 2006
Address: 6 Paora Road,, Kawerau.
Registered address used from 14 Mar 2001 to 31 Mar 2001
Address: 6 Paora Road, Kawerau
Physical address used from 02 Mar 2001 to 02 Mar 2001
Address: 293 Kahikatea Drive, Hamilton
Physical address used from 02 Mar 2001 to 21 Feb 2006
Address: -
Physical address used from 20 Feb 1992 to 02 Mar 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 50000
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 07 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Hoskin, Dudley Rex |
Edgecumbe Edgecumbe 3120 New Zealand |
15 Feb 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 19000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Owen Mcleod & Co Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036081561 |
Hamilton |
15 Feb 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 30000 | |||
Individual | Cook, Susan |
Whanarua Bay Te Kaha New Zealand |
13 Nov 1987 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Owen Mcleod & Co Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036081561 Company Number: 1283601 |
30 Jan 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Individual | Hoskin, Dudley Rex |
Kawerau |
30 Jan 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Entity | Bond Rigging And Scaffolding Limited (in Liq) Shareholder NZBN: 9429038079979 Company Number: 858944 |
30 Jan 2004 - 30 Jan 2004 | |
Entity | Owen Mcleod & Co Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036081561 Company Number: 1283601 |
30 Jan 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Entity | Bond Rigging And Scaffolding Limited (in Liq) Shareholder NZBN: 9429038079979 Company Number: 858944 |
30 Jan 2004 - 30 Jan 2004 |
Dudley Rex Hoskin - Director
Appointment date: 31 May 2001
Address: Edgecumbe, Edgecumbe, 3120 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2021
Address: Kawerau, Kawerau, 3127 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Mar 2016
Zak Hoskin - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Aug 2011
Termination date: 01 Jul 2014
Address: Rd 1, Cambridge, 3493 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Feb 2014
Susan Jacqulyn Cook - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Feb 1991
Termination date: 01 Jun 2011
Address: Whanarua Bay, Te Kaha,
Address used since 20 May 2003
Scott William Forsyth - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Feb 1991
Termination date: 31 May 2001
Address: Whakatane,
Address used since 12 Feb 1991
Dud-lee Enterprises Limited
61 Higgins Road
Mega Wreckers Limited
63 Higgins Road
Te Runanga O Kirikiriroa Charitable Trust
59 Higgins Road
Henry Property Investors Limited
68 Higgins Road
Hale Health Centre Limited
57 Higgins Road
Artiflax Limited
44 Higgins Road