Waytemore Forests Limited, a registered company, was started on 20 Jan 1987. 9429039670762 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Forestry ownership or management (excluding field operations)" (ANZSIC M696235) is how the company has been classified. This company has been supervised by 3 directors: Shirley-Ann Carter Mannering - an active director whose contract started on 26 Jan 2011,
Ricky John Mannering - an active director whose contract started on 26 Jan 2011,
Sir Richard Henry Alwyn Carter - an inactive director whose contract started on 16 May 1990 and was terminated on 26 Jan 2011.
Waytemore Forests Limited had been using Same As Registered Office as their physical address up to 08 Feb 1999.
Other names used by the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 16 Dec 2016 to 29 Jun 2017 they were called Waytemore Forests No.2 Limited, from 05 Feb 1992 to 16 Dec 2016 they were called Adfordston Farms Limited and from 20 Jan 1987 to 05 Feb 1992 they were called Adfordston Farms Limited 3.
Previous addresses
Address #1: Same As Registered Office New Zealand
Physical address used from 08 Feb 1999 to 08 Feb 1999
Address #2: 13 Floor, Tower Two, Shortland Centre, Shortland Str, Auckland
Registered address used from 08 Feb 1999 to 01 Apr 2003
Address #3: Deloittes House, 15 Putney Way, Manukau City
Registered address used from 23 Dec 1993 to 08 Feb 1999
Address #4: -
Physical address used from 19 Feb 1992 to 08 Feb 1999
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 7000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 25 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 7000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | R H A Carter Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040505718 |
Otahuhu Auckland |
20 Jan 1987 - |
Shirley-ann Carter Mannering - Director
Appointment date: 26 Jan 2011
Address: Rd 3, Papakura, 2583 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Jan 2011
Ricky John Mannering - Director
Appointment date: 26 Jan 2011
Address: Rd 3, Papakura, 2583 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Jan 2011
Sir Richard Henry Alwyn Carter - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 May 1990
Termination date: 26 Jan 2011
Address: Rd 3, Drury, 2579 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Mar 2010
Rangataua Investments Limited
22 Bell Ave
Waytemore International Limited
22 Bell Avenue
Ohutu Investments Limited
22 Bell Avenue
Lumbercorp N.z. Limited
22 Bell Avenue
Lumbercorp (bop) Limited
22 Bell Avenue
Waytemore Investments Limited
22 Bell Avenue
Bellcone Forest Limited
10c Maurice Road
China Forestry Group New Zealand Company Limited
45 O'rorke Road
Jubilee Forests Limited
67 L Elizabeth Knox Place
Komokoriki Forests Limited
100 Kerwyn Ave
Ohiwai Forest Farm Limited
Unit 4
Woodworx Limited
99 Namata Road