Paddy Smith Limited, a registered company, was registered on 04 Nov 1969. 9429040102689 is the NZ business number it was issued. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Patrick Vernon Smith - an active director whose contract began on 01 Sep 1992,
Diane Celia Mclaughlin - an inactive director whose contract began on 07 Feb 1997 and was terminated on 06 Jun 1997.
Last updated on 19 Jul 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 192A Morgans Road, Rd 2, Matamata (type: physical, registered).
Paddy Smith Limited had been using 99B Hadfield Street, Beachhaven, Auckland as their physical address up until 03 Feb 2009.
A total of 11000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 2200 shares (20%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 8800 shares (80%).
Previous addresses
Address: 99b Hadfield Street, Beachhaven, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 21 Aug 2008 to 03 Feb 2009
Address: C/-ngapuke Station, 192a Morgans Road, R D 2, Matamata
Physical address used from 28 Aug 2005 to 21 Aug 2008
Address: C/-ngapuke Station, 192a Morgans Road, R D 2, Matamata
Registered address used from 09 May 2005 to 21 Aug 2008
Address: Noble And Lee,, 51 Arawa Street,, Matamata.
Registered address used from 10 Mar 1997 to 09 May 2005
Address: Noble And Lee,, Arawa Street,, Matamata.
Registered address used from 26 Feb 1997 to 10 Mar 1997
Address: -
Physical address used from 18 Feb 1992 to 18 Feb 1992
Address: 99b Hadfield Street, Beachhaven, Auckland
Physical address used from 18 Feb 1992 to 28 Aug 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 11000
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 03 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 2200 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Morgan Road Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047698864 |
Putaruru Putaruru 3411 New Zealand |
16 Feb 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 8800 | |||
Individual | Smith, Patrick Vernon |
192a Morgans Road Rd 2, Matamata New Zealand |
04 Nov 1969 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Smith, Rupert Sinclair Tasman |
120 Broadway Matamata 3400 New Zealand |
29 Jan 2020 - 16 Feb 2021 |
Individual | Lee, David Stewart |
Matamata |
04 Nov 1969 - 13 Nov 2019 |
Patrick Vernon Smith - Director
Appointment date: 01 Sep 1992
Address: 192a Morgans Road, Rd 2, Matamata, 3472 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Sep 2015
Diane Celia Mclaughlin - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Feb 1997
Termination date: 06 Jun 1997
Address: Hamilton,
Address used since 07 Feb 1997