Brewer Holdings Limited was registered on 11 Nov 1968 and issued a number of 9429040104515. This registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Lynne Patricia Brewer - an active director whose contract started on 18 Dec 1981,
Graeme Francis Brewer - an active director whose contract started on 18 Dec 1981.
As stated in BizDb's database (updated on 19 Jul 2024), the company uses 1 address: 42 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville, 3300 (category: physical, service).
Up until 06 Nov 2012, Brewer Holdings Limited had been using 42 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville as their registered address.
BizDb found more names used by the company: from 11 Nov 1968 to 15 Nov 1994 they were named Morrinsville Wool Bar Limited.
A total of 22224 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 21102 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Brewer, Graeme Francis (an individual) located at Rd 7, Hamilton postcode 3287.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 5.05 per cent shares (exactly 1122 shares) and includes
Brewer, Lynne Patricia - located at Rd 7, Hamilton.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 42 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville, 3300 New Zealand
Registered address used from 03 Nov 2010 to 06 Nov 2012
Address #2: 42 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville, 3300 New Zealand
Physical address used from 03 Nov 2010 to 02 Nov 2018
Address #3: 232 Thames Street, Morrinsville New Zealand
Registered address used from 01 Nov 2001 to 03 Nov 2010
Address #4: 234 Thames St, Morrinsville
Registered address used from 01 Nov 2001 to 01 Nov 2001
Address #5: 232 Thames Street, Morrinsville New Zealand
Physical address used from 31 Oct 2001 to 03 Nov 2010
Address #6: 234 Thames St, Morrinsville
Physical address used from 31 Oct 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 22224
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 24 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 21102 | |||
Individual | Brewer, Graeme Francis |
Rd 7 Hamilton 3287 New Zealand |
11 Nov 1968 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1122 | |||
Individual | Brewer, Lynne Patricia |
Rd 7 Hamilton 3287 New Zealand |
11 Nov 1968 - |
Lynne Patricia Brewer - Director
Appointment date: 18 Dec 1981
Address: Rd 7, Hamilton, 3287 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Oct 2015
Graeme Francis Brewer - Director
Appointment date: 18 Dec 1981
Address: Rd 7, Hamilton, 3287 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Oct 2015
Miranda Dairy Limited
42 Moorhouse Street
Action Developments (2013) Limited
42 Moorhouse Street
Cms Auto & Marine Upholstery Limited
42 Moorhouse Street
Timesmart Limited
42 Moorhouse Street
Solar Partners Nz Limited
42 Moorhouse Street
Solar Quote Comparison Limited
42 Moorhouse Street