Potton & Burton Limited, a registered company, was started on 05 Nov 1968. 9429040189512 is the NZ business number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 4 directors: Craig Potton - an active director whose contract started on 10 Jan 1989,
Robert John Burton - an active director whose contract started on 23 Oct 2001,
Richard John Potton - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Aug 1997 and was terminated on 29 May 2018,
Richard Henry Potton - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Jan 1989 and was terminated on 01 Aug 1997.
Updated on 19 Jul 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 4 addresses this company registered, specifically: 319A Hardy Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 (registered address),
319A Hardy Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 (service address),
319A Hardy Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 (service address),
319 Hardy Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 (physical address) among others.
Potton & Burton Limited had been using 98 Vickerman Street, Nelson as their physical address until 27 Nov 2019.
More names used by this company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 05 Nov 1968 to 05 Mar 2015 they were named Craig Potton Publishing Limited.
A total of 10000 shares are issued to 3 shareholders (3 groups). The first group includes 5500 shares (55 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 1500 shares (15 per cent). Finally we have the third share allocation (3000 shares 30 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Other active addresses
Address #4: 319a Hardy Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 08 Dec 2023
Previous addresses
Address #1: 98 Vickerman Street, Nelson, 7040 New Zealand
Physical address used from 07 Dec 2007 to 27 Nov 2019
Address #2: 98 Vickerman Street, Nelson
Registered address used from 19 Jan 2002 to 07 Dec 2007
Address #3: 98 Vickerman Street, Nelson
Physical address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 07 Dec 2007
Address #4: 9 Buxton Square, Nelson
Registered address used from 22 Dec 1995 to 19 Jan 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 29 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 5500 | |||
Individual | Potton, Craig |
Nelson |
05 Nov 1968 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1500 | |||
Individual | Potton, Richard John |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 New Zealand |
05 Nov 1968 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 3000 | |||
Individual | Burton, Robert John |
Nelson Nelson 7010 New Zealand |
05 Nov 1968 - |
Craig Potton - Director
Appointment date: 10 Jan 1989
Address: Stepneyville, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Jan 2010
Robert John Burton - Director
Appointment date: 23 Oct 2001
Address: Nelson, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Jan 2011
Richard John Potton - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Aug 1997
Termination date: 29 May 2018
Address: Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Nov 2016
Richard Henry Potton - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Jan 1989
Termination date: 01 Aug 1997
Address: Nelson,
Address used since 10 Jan 1989
Flightcell International Limited
98 Vickerman Street
Flightcell New Zealand Limited
98 Vickerman Street
Kura Limited
Vickerman Street
King Reef Seafoods Nz Limited
Vickerman Street
Sealord Shellfish Limited
Vickerman Street
Sealord Group Limited
Vickerman Street