Phillips Motors Ashburton Limited, a registered company, was started on 27 May 1983. 9429040327402 is the NZ business number it was issued. The company has been run by 4 directors: Jonathan Luke Phillips - an active director whose contract started on 10 May 2023,
Heather Margaret Phillips - an inactive director whose contract started on 22 May 1996 and was terminated on 31 Jul 2024,
Darryl Francis Phillips - an inactive director whose contract started on 19 May 1988 and was terminated on 30 Sep 2022,
Annette Murielle Phillips - an inactive director whose contract started on 19 May 1988 and was terminated on 22 Dec 1993.
Updated on 06 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, physical).
Phillips Motors Ashburton Limited had been using Bennett Reddington Limited, 4Th Floor,199 Cashel Street, Christchurch as their physical address up to 15 Jun 2010.
Past names used by the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 27 May 1983 to 20 Jan 1994 they were called D & A Phillips Limited.
A total of 10000 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 1000 shares (10%) held by 3 entities. There is also a second group which includes 2 shareholders in control of 9000 shares (90%).
Previous addresses
Address: Bennett Reddington Limited, 4th Floor,199 Cashel Street, Christchurch
Physical & registered address used from 27 May 2004 to 15 Jun 2010
Address: 199 Cashel Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 09 Jul 1997 to 27 May 2004
Address: -
Physical address used from 17 Feb 1992 to 17 Feb 1992
Address: Bennett Sheard & Co, 199 Cashel Street, Christchurch
Physical address used from 17 Feb 1992 to 27 May 2004
Address: Victoria St, Ashburton
Registered address used from 13 Jan 1992 to 09 Jul 1997
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 30 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Independent Professional Trustees (2012) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031799539 |
50 Customhouse Quay Wellington New Zealand |
01 Aug 2024 - |
Individual | Phillips, Rebecca Alice |
Rolleston Rolleston 7614 New Zealand |
01 Aug 2024 - |
Director | Phillips, Jonathan Luke |
Rolleston Rolleston 7614 New Zealand |
01 Aug 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 9000 | |||
Individual | Gradwell, Francis George |
Thorndon Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
10 May 2023 - |
Individual | Haines, Douglas Peter |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
10 May 2023 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Phillips, Heather Margaret |
Rd 2 Ashburton 7772 New Zealand |
27 May 1983 - 01 Aug 2024 |
Individual | Phillips, Darryl Francis |
Rd 2 Ashburton 7772 New Zealand |
27 May 1983 - 10 May 2023 |
Jonathan Luke Phillips - Director
Appointment date: 10 May 2023
Address: Rolleston, Rolleston, 7614 New Zealand
Address used since 10 May 2023
Heather Margaret Phillips - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 May 1996
Termination date: 31 Jul 2024
Address: Rd 2, Ashburton, 7772 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Aug 2017
Address: Rd 2, Ashburton, 7772 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jun 2010
Darryl Francis Phillips - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 May 1988
Termination date: 30 Sep 2022
Address: Rd 2, Ashburton, 7772 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Aug 2017
Address: Rd 2, Ashburton, 7772 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jun 2010
Annette Murielle Phillips - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 May 1988
Termination date: 22 Dec 1993
Address: Ashburton,
Address used since 19 May 1988
Pooja Foods Limited
Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay
M G Bale Trustees (hill 16) Limited
Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street
Sounds Lifestyle Investments Limited
Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street
Customs Agents Wellington Limited
Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay
Ppem Nominees Limited
Level 14, 1-3 Willeston Street
Glading Family Trustees Limited
Level 10, Greenock House, 39 The Terrace