Eastville Farm Limited, a registered company, was registered on 24 May 1971. 9429040579184 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. This company has been managed by 3 directors: Graham Milne - an active director whose contract began on 01 Jul 2004,
Colin Mervyn Buckthought - an inactive director whose contract began on 10 Apr 1990 and was terminated on 01 Jul 2004,
Enid Faye Seales - an inactive director whose contract began on 10 Apr 1990 and was terminated on 19 Jul 2002.
Updated on 11 Sep 2024, our data contains detailed information about 2 addresses the company registered, namely: 84 Hillcrest Ave, Northcote, North Shore City (registered address),
84 Hillcrest Ave, Northcote (physical address),
84 Hillcrest Ave, Northcote (service address).
Eastville Farm Limited had been using 1 (B) Glenwood Ave, Birkenhead, Auckland as their physical address up until 26 May 2009.
Past names for the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 24 May 1971 to 23 Feb 1990 they were named John Seales Limited.
A total of 10000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 1602 shares (16.02 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 8398 shares (83.98 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 1 (b) Glenwood Ave, Birkenhead, Auckland
Physical address used from 13 Jun 2006 to 26 May 2009
Address #2: 1 (b) Glenwood Ave, Birkenhead
Registered address used from 13 Jun 2006 to 26 May 2009
Address #3: 24 Veronica Street, New Lynn, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 04 Aug 2003 to 13 Jun 2006
Address #4: 2 Redan Rd, Kaitaia
Registered address used from 30 Jun 1998 to 04 Aug 2003
Address #5: 2 Redan Rd, Kaitaia
Physical address used from 30 Jun 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Address #6: 2 Redan Road, Kaitaia
Physical address used from 30 Jun 1998 to 04 Aug 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 30 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1602 | |||
Individual | Milne, Graham |
Hillcrest North Shore City 0627 New Zealand |
06 Dec 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 8398 | |||
Other (Other) | Graham Milne Trust |
Hillcrest Auckland 0627 New Zealand |
03 Mar 2018 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Ohawini Bay Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035949954 Company Number: 1320021 |
Northcote New Zealand |
06 Dec 2010 - 03 Mar 2018 |
Entity | Ohawini Bay Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035949954 Company Number: 1320021 |
Northcote New Zealand |
06 Dec 2010 - 03 Mar 2018 |
Individual | Buckthought, Colin Mervyn |
Okaihau |
24 May 1971 - 07 Jun 2005 |
Entity | Kauri Point Farm Park Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037105679 Company Number: 1090880 |
07 Jun 2005 - 06 Dec 2010 | |
Entity | Eastville Farm Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040579184 Company Number: 81646 |
24 May 1971 - 07 Jun 2005 | |
Entity | Eastville Farm Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040579184 Company Number: 81646 |
24 May 1971 - 07 Jun 2005 | |
Entity | Kauri Point Farm Park Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037105679 Company Number: 1090880 |
07 Jun 2005 - 06 Dec 2010 | |
Entity | Ohawini Bay Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035949954 Company Number: 1320021 |
Northcote New Zealand |
06 Dec 2010 - 03 Mar 2018 |
Entity | Ohawini Bay Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035949954 Company Number: 1320021 |
Northcote New Zealand |
06 Dec 2010 - 03 Mar 2018 |
Graham Milne - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2004
Address: Hillcrest, North Shore City, 0627 New Zealand
Address used since 19 May 2010
Colin Mervyn Buckthought - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Apr 1990
Termination date: 01 Jul 2004
Address: Ohaewai, R D 2, Kaikohe,
Address used since 10 Jun 2002
Enid Faye Seales - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Apr 1990
Termination date: 19 Jul 2002
Address: Okaihau,
Address used since 10 Apr 1990
Country Tv Limited
41 Taharoto Road
Canterbury Fresh Properties Limited
41 Taharoto Road
Shea Tce Properties Limited
41 Taharoto Road
Harvey Investment Fund Limited
41 Taharoto Road
Harvey Properties Limited
41 Taharoto Road
Anidea Limited
41 Taharoto Road