Paton Properties Limited, a registered company, was launched on 30 Jul 1964. 9429040661018 is the number it was issued. The company has been managed by 3 directors: Kelvin George Paton - an active director whose contract started on 12 Sep 1989,
Gaylene Margaret Paton - an active director whose contract started on 12 Sep 1989,
Brooke John Paton - an inactive director whose contract started on 03 Aug 1992 and was terminated on 12 Jan 2015.
Last updated on 26 Jul 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 12 Miller Rise, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 (type: physical, registered).
Paton Properties Limited had been using 96 Tindalls Bay Road, Tindalls Beach, Whangaparaoa as their physical address up until 13 Jul 2017.
Previous names for the company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 17 Apr 1996 to 21 Sep 1998 they were named Steelpac Properties Limited, from 05 May 1985 to 17 Apr 1996 they were named Steelpac Buildings (New Zealand) Limited and from 30 Jul 1964 to 05 May 1985 they were named Kelvin G. Paton Limited.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 3000 shares) - K G & G M Trustee Limited - located at 0932, Silverdale, Silverdale.
Previous addresses
Address: 96 Tindalls Bay Road, Tindalls Beach, Whangaparaoa, 0930 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 10 Jul 2012 to 13 Jul 2017
Address: 96 Tindalls Road, Tindalls Bay, Whangaparaoa New Zealand
Physical address used from 02 Oct 1997 to 10 Jul 2012
Address: 3 Main Highway, Ellerslie, Auckland 5
Physical address used from 02 Oct 1997 to 02 Oct 1997
Address: 96 Tindalls Bay Road, Tindalls Bay, Whangaparaoa New Zealand
Registered address used from 23 Sep 1997 to 10 Jul 2012
Address: 3 Main Highway, Ellerslie, Auckland 5
Registered address used from 23 Sep 1997 to 23 Sep 1997
Address: Mill Rd, Helensville
Registered address used from 12 Nov 1993 to 23 Sep 1997
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 3000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 02 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 3000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | K G & G M Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041595916 |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 New Zealand |
04 Jun 2015 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Paton, Kelvin George |
Tindalls Bay Whangaparaoa 0930 New Zealand |
30 Jul 1964 - 04 Jun 2015 |
Individual | Paton, Gaylene Margaret |
Tindalls Bay Whangaparaoa 0930 New Zealand |
30 Jul 1964 - 04 Jun 2015 |
Entity | Hibiscus Independent Trustees 2011 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031108225 Company Number: 3379416 |
04 Jul 2012 - 04 Jun 2015 | |
Entity | Hibiscus Independent Trustees 2011 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031108225 Company Number: 3379416 |
04 Jul 2012 - 04 Jun 2015 |
Kelvin George Paton - Director
Appointment date: 12 Sep 1989
Address: Silverdale, Auckland, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Jul 2015
Gaylene Margaret Paton - Director
Appointment date: 12 Sep 1989
Address: Silverdale, Auckland, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Jul 2015
Brooke John Paton - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Aug 1992
Termination date: 12 Jan 2015
Address: Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Aug 1992
Ohdeer Nz Limited
16 Miller Rise
K G & G M Trustee Limited
12 Miller Rise
Massey Education Consulting Co. Limited
48 Miller Rise
Zh Group Holdings Limited
60 Miller Rise
L & Rv Company Limited
4 Miller Rise
Beme Holdings Limited
30 Miller Rise