Dna Property (2017) Limited, a registered company, was registered on 31 Mar 1924. 9429040750767 is the NZBN it was issued. This company has been supervised by 6 directors: David Norman Ambler - an active director whose contract started on 16 Aug 1991,
Dean Alan Ellwood - an active director whose contract started on 12 Feb 2002,
Noel Barclay - an inactive director whose contract started on 16 Aug 1991 and was terminated on 11 Dec 2013,
David Wilkie Watson - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Aug 1991 and was terminated on 30 Nov 2002,
Norman Godfray Ambler - an inactive director whose contract started on 16 Aug 1991 and was terminated on 17 Jan 2002.
Updated on 15 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 481 Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland, 1026 (types include: registered, physical).
Dna Property (2017) Limited had been using 272-276 Great North Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland as their physical address until 08 May 2013.
Old names for the company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 31 Mar 1924 to 01 Sep 2017 they were called Ambler & Co Limited, from 31 Mar 1924 to 01 Sep 2017 they were called Ambler & Co Limited.
A total of 5000000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 3020000 shares (60.4 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 1980000 shares (39.6 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: 272-276 Great North Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 28 Sep 2001 to 08 May 2013
Address: C/- Davenports, 99 Albert Street, Auckland
Physical address used from 28 Sep 2001 to 28 Sep 2001
Address: 272 Great North Rd, Grey Lynn, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 12 Jun 1997 to 08 May 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 5000000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 21 Jun 2022
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 3020000 | |||
Individual | Harper, Gordon Raymond |
Sunnyhills Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
23 May 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1980000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | David Ambler Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031880060 |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
02 Jul 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Barclay, Noel |
Epsom |
31 Mar 1924 - 02 Jul 2013 |
Individual | Ambler, David Norman |
Takapuna Auckland |
31 Mar 1924 - 02 Jul 2013 |
Individual | Schlichting, Helen Bronwyn |
Browns Bay Auckland |
31 Mar 1924 - 11 Jun 2008 |
Individual | Barclay, Noel |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
16 Oct 2008 - 27 Oct 2017 |
Individual | Barclay-trustee-norman Ambler Fly Trust, Noel |
Grey Lynn Auckland |
17 Jun 2004 - 17 Jun 2004 |
Individual | Ellwood-trustee-norman Ambler Fly Trust, Dean Alan |
Auckland |
17 Jun 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Ellwood, Dean Alan |
Greenlane Auckland |
31 Mar 1924 - 14 Jun 2005 |
Individual | Ellwood, Dean Alan |
Greenlane Auckland |
16 Oct 2008 - 02 Jul 2013 |
Individual | Dean Alan Ellwood |
Greenlane Auckland |
31 Mar 1924 - 14 Jun 2005 |
Individual | Helen Bronwyn Schlichting |
Browns Bay Auckland |
31 Mar 1924 - 11 Jun 2008 |
Individual | David Norman Ambler |
Takapuna Auckland |
31 Mar 1924 - 02 Jul 2013 |
Individual | Noel Barclay |
Epsom |
31 Mar 1924 - 02 Jul 2013 |
David Norman Ambler - Director
Appointment date: 16 Aug 1991
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Jun 2015
Dean Alan Ellwood - Director
Appointment date: 12 Feb 2002
Address: Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Feb 2002
Noel Barclay - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Aug 1991
Termination date: 11 Dec 2013
Address: Epsom,
Address used since 16 Aug 1991
David Wilkie Watson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Aug 1991
Termination date: 30 Nov 2002
Address: Meadowbank, Auckland,
Address used since 10 Aug 1991
Norman Godfray Ambler - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Aug 1991
Termination date: 17 Jan 2002
Address: Epsom, Auckland,
Address used since 16 Aug 1991
Dieter Schlichting - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Aug 1991
Termination date: 31 Mar 1999
Address: Kohimarama,
Address used since 16 Aug 1991
Taheke Forest Limited
483d Rosebank Road
Duggan Family Trustees Limited
483d Rosebank Road
Squash Xl Limited
483d Rosebank Road
Knezovich Holdings Limited
483d Rosebank Road
Waterview Consulting Limited
483d Rosebank Road
Impact Development Training Limited
483d Rosebank Road