Wayne D Fisk Limited, a registered company, was registered on 29 Apr 1983. 9429040753959 is the NZ business number it was issued. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Wayne Darryl Fisk - an active director whose contract began on 29 Apr 1983,
Charles William Fisk - an inactive director whose contract began on 29 Apr 1983 and was terminated on 11 Mar 2001.
Updated on 01 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: Cmb 97, Kaitoke, Upper Hutt, 5018 (category: registered, physical).
Wayne D Fisk Limited had been using 10 Gregory Street, Naenae, Lower Hutt as their physical address up until 20 Nov 2018.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 5000 shares) - Fisk, Wayne D - located at 5018, Kaitoke, Upper Hutt.
Previous addresses
Address: 10 Gregory Street, Naenae, Lower Hutt New Zealand
Physical address used from 30 May 1997 to 20 Nov 2018
Address: 66 Hay Street, Naenae, Lower Hutt, 5011 New Zealand
Registered address used from 30 May 1997 to 20 Nov 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 5000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 02 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Individual | Fisk, Wayne D |
Kaitoke Upper Hutt 5018 New Zealand |
29 Apr 1983 - |
Wayne Darryl Fisk - Director
Appointment date: 29 Apr 1983
Address: Kaitoke, Upper Hutt, 5018 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Nov 2018
Address: Naenae, Lower Hutt, 5011 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Apr 1983
Charles William Fisk - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Apr 1983
Termination date: 11 Mar 2001
Address: Naenae, Lower Hutt,
Address used since 29 Apr 1983
Raising The Roof Trust Board
64 Hay Street
L.v. Metalformers Limited
224 Rata Street
Lavea'i Trust Inc.
249 Rata Street
B & D Painting Decorators Limited
40 Hay Street
Pinto Holdings Limited
9 Boyd Grove
Inwood Concepts Limited
9 Boyd Grove